Erie Insurance Company v. McKay et al
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Company
Defendant: William Lansbury, Amy McKay and Frank McKay
Case Number: 5:2020cv01282
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Frank McKay.(Devabhakthuni, Sanjeev)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against Erie Insurance Company by William Lansbury, Amy McKay.(Smolak, Jan)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed #8 Letter Request filed by defendant Frank McKay for an extension of time to respond to the complaint, which is granted. Frank McKay answer due 12/4/2020. Counsel are reminded that requests for extensions of deadlines must be made before the relevant deadline expires and shall contain a good cause reason for the extension, even if the parties stipulate. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/12/2020. (sg )
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Letter request for extension of time to answer filed by Frank McKay. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Devabhakthuni, Sanjeev) Modified on 11/12/2020 (sg, ).
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjeev Devabhakthuni on behalf of Frank McKay (Devabhakthuni, Sanjeev)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erie Insurance Company. Amy McKay served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Ehman, Jennifer)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erie Insurance Company. Frank McKay served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Ehman, Jennifer)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Lansbury. William Lansbury waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Smolak, Jan)
October 27, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for William Lansbury answer due 11/19/2020. (hmr)
October 27, 2020 CORRECTIVE TEXT NOTICE: Answer deadline for defendant William Lansbury is corrected to 11/19/2020 per the Dkt. No. #4 Waiver of Service Executed. (hmr)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/12/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to William Lansbury, Amy McKay, Frank McKay. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for William Lansbury, #2 Summons Issued for Amy McKay)(hmr)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Lansbury, Amy McKay, Frank McKay (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5282659) filed by Erie Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erie Insurance Company v. McKay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Ehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lansbury
Represented By: Jan M. Smolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy McKay
Represented By: Jan M. Smolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank McKay
Represented By: Sanjeev Devabhakthuni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?