Arnold v. Town of Camillus, New York et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Arnold
Defendant: David Callahan, John Doe(s), Steven James, Mike LaFlair, Town of Camillus, New York, Town Supervisor Mary Ann Coogan, Captain James Nightingale, Jane Doe(s), Joy Flood, Police Chief Thomas Winn, Dick Griffo and Mary Luber
Case Number: 5:2020cv01364
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's state law claims to NYS Supreme Court, Onondaga County filed by Patricia Arnold. (ban)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Letter Request: It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's request for leave to file a reply brief is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the reply memorandum, attached to the plaintiff's letter request, as a separate entry on the docket. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/23/20. (ban)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter Request/ Letter Motion from A.J. Bosman, Esq. for Patricia Arnold requesting Leave to File a Reply Memorandum of Law submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Reply)(Bosman, AJ)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's state law claims to NYS Supreme Court, Onondaga County filed by David Callahan, Mary Ann Coogan, Jane Doe(s), Joy Flood, Dick Griffo, Steven James, John Doe(s), Mike LaFlair, Mary Luber, James Nightingale, Town of Camillus, New York, Thomas Winn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Premo, Kseniya)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of Motion to Remand #9 , the Rule 16 initial conference scheduled for 12/9/2020, and related deadlines, are STAYED without date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/1/2020.(jdp )
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's state law claims to NYS Supreme Court, Onondaga County Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2021 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 12/21/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/28/2020. filed by Patricia Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Attorney Affirmation, #2 Exhibit A: Pl.'s Motion Papers filed in NYS Supreme Court, #3 Exhibit B: Proposed Stipulation, #4 Exhibit C: E-mail correspondence between counsel, #5 Memorandum of Law) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Bosman, AJ)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by David Callahan, Mary Ann Coogan, Joy Flood, Dick Griffo, Steven James, Mike LaFlair, Mary Luber, James Nightingale, Town of Camillus, New York, Thomas Winn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Premo, Kseniya)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David Callahan, Mary Ann Coogan, Joy Flood, Dick Griffo, Steven James, Mike LaFlair, Mary Luber, James Nightingale, Town of Camillus, New York, Thomas Winn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Premo, Kseniya)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Ferrara on behalf of David Callahan, Mary Ann Coogan, Joy Flood, Dick Griffo, Steven James, Mike LaFlair, Mary Luber, James Nightingale, Town of Camillus, New York, Thomas Winn (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Ferrara, David)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kseniya Premo on behalf of David Callahan, Mary Ann Coogan, Joy Flood, Dick Griffo, Steven James, Mike LaFlair, Mary Luber, James Nightingale, Town of Camillus, New York, Thomas Winn (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Premo, Kseniya)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (hmr)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for David Callahan answer due 11/12/2020; Mary Ann Coogan answer due 11/12/2020; Joy Flood answer due 11/12/2020; Dick Griffo answer due 11/12/2020; Steven James answer due 11/12/2020; Mike LaFlair answer due 11/12/2020; Mary Luber answer due 11/12/2020; James Nightingale answer due 11/12/2020; Town of Camillus, New York answer due 11/12/2020; Thomas Winn answer due 11/12/2020. (hmr)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AMD COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (hmr)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Onondaga County Supreme Court, case number 006548/2020 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5305131) filed by Thomas Winn, Mike LaFlair, John Doe(s), Dick Griffo, Town of Camillus, New York, Jane Doe(s), James Nightingale, Mary Ann Coogan, David Callahan, Joy Flood, Steven James, Mary Luber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Notice to Clerk of Removal, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Town of Camillus, New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Callahan
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven James
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike LaFlair
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Camillus, New York
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Supervisor Mary Ann Coogan
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain James Nightingale
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe(s)
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Flood
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Chief Thomas Winn
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Griffo
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Luber
Represented By: David M. Ferrara
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Arnold
Represented By: AJ Bosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?