Wentling et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: John L. Wentling and Theresa A. Wentling
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv01592
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States of America.(Stack, Emer)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John L. Wentling, Theresa A. Wentling served on United States Attorney (Laraby, Daniel)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ransom P. Reynolds, III on behalf of United States of America (Reynolds, Ransom)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emer M. Stack on behalf of United States of America (Stack, Emer)
December 29, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service: Clerk removed "USAG" and added "U.S. Attorney and on 12/23/2020" to Dkt. No. #4 . Clerk also added "on 12/23/2020 to Dkt. No. #5 . (hmr)
December 29, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for United States of America answer due 2/22/2021. (hmr)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John L. Wentling, Theresa A. Wentling of S&C on USAG, Washington, D.C. on 12/23/2020. (Laraby, Daniel) Modified on 12/29/2020 (hmr).
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John L. Wentling, Theresa A. Wentling of S&C on US Attorney Syracuse, NY on 12/23/2020 (Laraby, Daniel) Modified on 12/29/2020 (hmr).
December 23, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Complaint. Clerk replaced Attachment 1 - Exhibit A with the redacted document. The original document that was filed did not have the date of births redacted. Exhibit A is now correct with date of births redacted. (kmc)
December 22, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Complaint: Clerk replaced Attachment 1 - Exhibit A with the correct document, Exhibit B was uploaded as Exhibit A in error. Both exhibits are now the correct documents. (hmr)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/17/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney's Office)(hmr)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5358165) filed by Theresa A. Wentling, John L. Wentling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Form 95, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from VA, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/22/2020) (hmr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wentling et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Wentling
Represented By: Michael Scott Porter
Represented By: Daniel P. Laraby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A. Wentling
Represented By: Michael Scott Porter
Represented By: Daniel P. Laraby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ransom P. Reynolds, III
Represented By: Emer M. Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?