Brown v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Brown
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC, Abbvie, Inc., Allergan U.S., Abbvie US LLC and Allergan PLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00018
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #28. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2921 Allergan Biocell Textured Breast Implant Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Brian R. Martinotti, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
January 25, 2021 Case transferred electronically to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2921 Allergan Biocell Textured Breast Implant Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Brian R. Martinotti, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
January 25, 2021 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 2:21-cv-01107, filed 01/25/2021. (plp)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/7/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allergan PLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Allergan U.S., #2 Summons Issued as to Allergan Sales, LLC, #3 Summons Issued as to Abbvie Inc., #4 Summons Issued as to Abbvie US LLC)(pjh, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abbvie US LLC, Abbvie, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC and Allergan U.S. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5374535) filed by Tammy Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Brown
Represented By: Jarrod W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?