MPL Armory, LLC v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MPL Armory, LLC
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00040
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation: Deadline for Mediator Selection is 3/17/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/17/2021. (sg )
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 4 days to be held at Utica, NY. Rule 33 and 34 Requests to be served by 3/5/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 4/19/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2021. Mandatory Mediation completion deadline 6/30/2021. Fact Discovery due by 10/15/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/29/2021. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2021. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 12/15/2021. Discovery due by 1/14/2022. Discovery motions due 1/21/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/17/2021. (sg)
February 17, 2021 TEXT NOTICE of Telephone Conference: A Telephone Status Conference has been set for 6/9/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Counsel are directed to call the following number for this conference: 1-877-336-1829, access code 8029754, security code 4382.(sg)
February 16, 2021 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/16/2021. Appearances: Martin Lynn, Esq. for Plaintiff; Peter Perkowski, Esq. o/b/o Lance Kalik, Esq. for Defendant. Court reviews Civil Case Management Plan. Rule 26 Mandatory disclosures completed by both parties. Court notes a demand for jury trial has been filed and there being no objection, Court approves. Case referred into Mandatory Mediation. Pretrial deadlines are established, a scheduling order and mediation referral order will be issued. (sg )
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MPL Armory, LLC. (Lynn, Martin)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by MPL Armory, LLC. (Lynn, Martin)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed docket in advance of the 2/16/2021 telephone Rule 16 Conference and finds that the Civil Case Management Plan, due 2/9/2021, was not filed as ordered nor has any party requested an extension of time from the Court. Court sua sponte extends deadline to file Civil Case Management Plan to NO LATER THAN 2/11/2021 and reminds counsel that Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before one week prior to the date of the conference. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.)) SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/10/2021. (sg)
February 8, 2021 ***PLEASE READ*** IMPORTANT TEXT NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: the 2/16/2021 10:15AM Telephone Rule 16 Conference: Counsel are directed to call the following number for this conference: 1-877-336-1829, access code 8029754, security code 8945. (sg)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Kalik, Lance)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER approving #5 Stipulation and granting extension of time for defendant to respond to complaint. Answer due date updated for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company: answer due 2/3/2021. The telephone Rule 16 initial conference and related deadlines remain as set by General Order 25. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/19/2021. (sg )
January 18, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, /STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, RESPOND OR OTHERWISE MOVE by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company submitted to Judge David N. Hurd. (Kalik, Lance)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc. for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.. (Kalik, Lance)
January 15, 2021 ***Answer deadline set for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company to 1/20/2021. (jmb)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/9/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT: relating to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (jmb)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: with State Court Exhibits attached from NYS Supreme Court - County of Onondaga, case number 2020-008091 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5380629) filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/15/2021) (jmb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MPL Armory, LLC v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MPL Armory, LLC
Represented By: Martin A. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance J. Kalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?