Rogers v. Pfizer et al
Plaintiff: Megan Rogers
Defendant: Pfizer, Cuomo, Biotech and Cuomo/Fauci/CDC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00176
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and REPORT-RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Megan Rogers - That Plaintiff's IFP Application (Dkt. No. 2) is GRANTED solely for purposes of initial review. That Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel (Dkt. No. 3) is DENIED with leave to renew. RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. 1) be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. (Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2021, Case Review Deadline 4/26/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/9/2021. (Copy served via regular mail)(jel, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE returned executed by Megan Rogers. (jel, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and mailed to Megan Rogers along with a copy of the Local Rules and Pro Se Assistance Program Pamphlet. (pjh, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Megan Rogers, Pro Se. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (pjh, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Megan Rogers, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Plaintiff, #2 Proposed Summons as to Pfizer, #3 Proposed Summons as to Pfizer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (pjh, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Biotech, Cuomo, Cuomo/Fauci/CDC and Pfizer filed by Megan Rogers, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Pfizer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biotech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuomo/Fauci/CDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?