E.J. v. United States of America
Plaintiff: E.J.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv00327
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for United States of America answer due 6/7/2021. (dpk)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Initial Pleadings w. exhibits , filed by E.J.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AOS US ATTY - Syracuse)(Falgiatano, Charles)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ransom P. Reynolds, III on behalf of United States of America (Reynolds, Ransom)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General)(dpk)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. All conferences will be conducted by way of telephone conference. The parties are directed to call (877) 402-9753 and enter access code 9983518. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/16/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNYNDC-5467118) filed by E.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Attorney Letter/Correspondence - Claim for Damage, Injury or Death), #2 Exhibit (Certified Mailing Receipt), #3 Certificate of Merit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.J. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.J.
Represented By: Charles L. Falgiatano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ransom P. Reynolds, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?