Jonza v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Jonza
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. and CooperSurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00393
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #16. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Georgia for inclusion into MDL-2974 Paragard IUD Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Leigh Martin May, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
April 26, 2021 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Georgia for inclusion into MDL-2974. (plp)
April 26, 2021 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Northern District of Georgia as case 1:21-cv-01695, filed 04/26/2021. (plp)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Jonza. The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Jonza. Teva Women's Health, LLC served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Jonza. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Jonza. Teva Women's Health, Inc. served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Jonza. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Jonza. CooperSurgical, Inc. served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference by Telephone set for 7/14/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/7/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health LLC, #2 Summons Issued for Teva Women's Health, LLC, #3 Summons Issued for Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #4 Summons Issued for The Cooper Companies, Inc., #5 Summons Issued for CooperSurgical, Inc.)(map)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5485182) filed by Samantha Jonza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jonza v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Jonza
Represented By: Randi A. Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?