Hundley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lorraine M. Hundley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv00437
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael L. Henry appearing for Commissioner of Social Security as Co-Counsel With Ronald Makawa . (Henry, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge David N. Hurd and US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. (plp)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald W. Makawa appearing for Commissioner of Social Security 21-437. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 7/19/2021. (Makawa, Ronald)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Lorraine M. Hundley advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Olinsky, Howard)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that the Social Security Consent/Declination Form is due by 5/10/2021. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 4/19/2021. (kmc)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 5/10/2021. (dpk)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lorraine M. Hundley (dpk)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (dpk)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hundley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine M. Hundley
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ronald W. Makawa
Represented By: Michael L. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?