Szymanoski v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Steven S Szymanoski
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2021cv00534
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: This case is CONSOLIDATED with Lead Case 5:21-cv-00531-GTS-ML Krell et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al, the Court having deemed this case related to 5:21-cv-00531-GTS-ML Krell et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al under Section G.2 of General Order 12 because there exists a similarity of facts and legal issues between the two cases that will likely result in a substantial saving of judicial resources. Therefore, Civil Action No. 5:21-cv-00531-GTS-ML Krell et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al shall be deemed the "LEAD CASE" and this case shall be deemed a "Member Case." ALL FUTURE FILINGS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD ACTION ONLY, 5:21-cv-00531-GTS-ML Krell et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al. NO FURTHER SUBMISSIONS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS ACTION. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 5/17/2021. (jdp )
May 17, 2021 Case 5:21-CV-531 will be the lead case and all further docketing shall be done in the lead case ONLY. (jdp )
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment of case to Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby and Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. The cases are deemed related. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 5/12/2021. (sal )
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Quinn, Vivian)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Quinn, Vivian)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Scarpello, Tracey)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 Letter/NOTICE by Attorney Richard B. North, Esq. advising he will not be representing Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated in this case. (re #5 Notice of Admission Requirement) (plp)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants; Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Esq., Email address is richard.north@nelsonmullins.com. Phone number is 404-322-6000. Admissions due by 5/25/2021. {Attorney North served by email} (jmb)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02931. electronically transferred when case opened. {Onondaga County} (jmb)
May 10, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 5:19-CV-1126 (GTS/ML). (jmb)
May 7, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 *AMENDED by Doc. #3 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16886433 filed by Steven S Szymanoski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
May 8, 2019 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2931-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szymanoski v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven S Szymanoski
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?