Gaffney v. Unum Group et al
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Gaffney
Defendant: Unum Group and Provident Life and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00700
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Provident Life and Casualty Insurance Company, Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(Wright, Robert)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation. Defendants answer now due August 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/27/2021. (jdp )
July 27, 2021 ***Answer now due for Provident Life and Casualty Insurance Company and Unum Group by 8/12/2021. (jdp )
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by Provident Life and Casualty Insurance Company, Unum Group submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric, U.S.M.J.. (Wright, Robert)
July 9, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Provident Life and Casualty Insurance Company answer due 7/16/2021. (pjh, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, General Order 25 served on Provident Life and Casualty Insurance Company on June 25, 2021, filed by Joseph M. Gaffney. (Lynn-Ford, Patricia)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and General Order 25 served on UNUM Group on 06/21/21, filed by Joseph M. Gaffney. (Lynn-Ford, Patricia)
July 7, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Unum Group answer due 7/12/2021. (pjh, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (jmb)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/8/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for Provident Life and Casualty Insurance Company) (jmb)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: against Unum Group and Provident Life and Casualty Insurance Company, (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5555535) filed by Joseph M. Gaffney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaffney v. Unum Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Gaffney
Represented By: Patricia A. Lynn-Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Robert Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?