United States of America v. $12,257 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $12,257 in United States Currency
Case Number: 5:2021cv00723
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of USM Returned Executed as to Caprice Hibbler on 7/12/2021. Sent via Certified Mail on 07/07/2021. (map)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of USM Returned Executed on 7/7/2021. Arrested and placed property in custody of the United States Marshal Service filed by United States of America. (map)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM Returned Executed on 7/07/2021. (map)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued filed by United States of America. (khr)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $12,257 in United States Currency filed by United States of America.(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $12,257 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $12,257 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Adam J. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?