Brown v. Maher et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Brown
Defendant: Brian P Maher, John Snyder and Margaret Montfort-Balfour
Case Number: 5:2021cv01018
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER GRATING LETTER REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER: Pursuant to the verbal order of the Hon. David N. Hurd, USDJ, the Letter Request, #14 First Letter Motion from Melissa A. Latino, Esq. for Brian P Maher, Margaret Montfort-Balfour, John Snyder, requesting an extension of the date for State Defendants to answer the Complaint, to November 19, 2021 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 10/27/2021. (ptm)
October 27, 2021 Filing 14 First Letter Motion from Melissa A. Latino, Esq. for Brian P Maher, Margaret Montfort-Balfour, John Snyder requesting Extension of Answer Deadline submitted to Judge Hon. David T. Hurd . (Latino, Melissa)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 In light of the Stipulation and Order filed at DKT. No. #12 Court appearance scheduled for Wednesday October 6, 2021 is Cancelled. Parties are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks for review of pretrial proceedings that maybe needed and or the settlement / resolution of this matter. (ptm)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED AND ORDERED, by and between the undersigned, as follows: 1. Plaintiff shall be allowed to have contact with Ms. Saleh's three children during the wedding rehearsal dinner on October 8, 2021 as well as the ceremony and reception held on October 9, 2021 2. Plaintiff's #2 motion for a preliminary injunction is hereby withdrawn without prejudice. 3. Parties shall work together to develop a Safety Plan with Plaintiff's Sex Offender Treatment Program provider regarding further contact with Plaintiffs fiance's three children, if and as applicable. 4. This agreement may be amended or vacated pursuant to the Parties' agreement or by Court order. 5. This stipulation is solely for the purpose of settlement of Plaintiffs order to show cause for preliminary injunctive relief and is without prejudice to the parties' legal and equitable rights and defense in this action. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 10/5/2021. (pjh, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Latino on behalf of Brian P Maher, Margaret Montfort-Balfour, John Snyder (Latino, Melissa)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 Letter Motion from Plaintiff's Counsel for Daniel Brown requesting Cancellation of the October 6th Oral Argument submitted to Judge Hurd . (Cotter, Joshua)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Daniel Brown submitted to Judge Hurd. (Cotter, Joshua)
September 30, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Clerk modified the #8 Response to Order to Show Cause to reflect that is is a duplicate of the #7 Response. (pjh, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 ***DUPLICATE OF #7 *** RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Brian P Maher, Margaret Montfort-Balfour, John Snyder. (Latino, Melissa) Modified on 9/30/2021 (pjh, ).
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Brian P Maher, Margaret Montfort-Balfour, John Snyder. (Latino, Melissa)
September 21, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Brian P Maher, Margaret Montfort-Balfour, and John Snyder answers due 10/12/2021. (pjh, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Order, Motion Papers, and General Order 25 served on All Defendants on September 20, 2021, filed by Daniel Brown. (Cotter, Joshua)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff Daniel Brown's motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file and serve all submissions in opposition to plaintiff Daniel Brown's motion for a preliminary injunction on or before Wednesday, September 29, 2021; and it is further ORDERED that no reply is permitted; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff Daniel Brown shall serve defendants with this Order, the operative complaint and supporting exhibits, the motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction no later than Monday, September 20, 2021. Oral argument is scheduled for Wednesday, October 6, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. at the United States Courthouse, 10 Broad Street, Utica, New York, 13501 to determine whether the Court should issue a preliminary injunction preventing defendants from enforcing plaintiff Daniel Brown's parole condition barring him from contact with Mariam Saleh's children. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/16/2021. (pjh, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/8/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brian P Maher, #1 John Snyder, and #2 Margaret Montfort-Balfour).(gmd, )
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniel Brown. Motion returnable before Judge Judge Daniel N. Hurd Response to Motion due by 10/7/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Attorney Declaration) (gmd, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2021: #3 Exhibits 1-3, #4 Exhibits 4-6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibits 8-10, #7 Exhibits 11-14) (gmd, ). Modified on 9/16/2021 to reflect OSC.(lmw).
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian P Maher, Margaret Montfort-Balfour, John Snyder (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5649127) filed by Daniel Brown. (Attachments: #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd, ) Modified on 9/16/2021(gmd, ).
September 16, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Clerk moved Exhibits 1-14 to the proper entry from the #1 Complaint to the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (gmd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Maher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Brown
Represented By: Joshua T. Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P Maher
Represented By: Melissa A. Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Snyder
Represented By: Melissa A. Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Montfort-Balfour
Represented By: Melissa A. Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?