Dryden Mutual Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Plaintiff: Dryden Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv01148
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Broan-Nutone, LLC re #10 Response to Order to Show Cause, (Leach, David)
December 17, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Answer, #3 Exhibit(s) C - dfs supervising & regulating, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Report on Examination fo Dryden Mutual drafted by DFS, #5 Exhibit(s) E - NYS Insurance DFS Information, #6 Exhibit(s) F - Dryden Mutual Website Information, #7 Memorandum of Law, #8 Affidavit Affidavit of Dean Byczynski)(Leach, David)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of Orders [4, 7] by the District Judge, Letter Motion #8 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that the Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 11/24/2021, before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric via telephone conference, and the deadlines to file the Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures, are STAYED without date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/15/2021. (jdp )
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Matthew E. Whritenour, Esq. for Dryden Mutual Insurance Company requesting an extension to file Rule 26 Disclosure submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes . (Whritenour, Matthew)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: granting #6 Letter Request for an extension of time. Defendant's memorandum showing cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is due by 12/17/2021. Plaintiff may respond to Defendant's submission on or before 1/3/2022. The parties are reminded that submissions shall not exceed fifteen pages in length. So Ordered by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 11/9/2021. (nmk)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 Letter Motion from David E. Leach, Esq. for Broan-Nutone, LLC requesting an enlargement of time to respond to Court's Order to Show Cause submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes . (Leach, David)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Broan-Nutone, LLC.(Alweis, Kenneth)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is ORDERED that Defendant Broan-NuTone, LLC ("the removing Defendant") shall file a memorandum, not to exceed fifteen pages by November 16, 2021, showing cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. It is further ORDERED that if the removing Defendant maintains that there is complete diversity between the parties, it shall submit supporting evidence, including affidavits identifying the citizenship of each member of the limited liability company or unincorporated entity. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff may respond to the removing Defendants' submission, with a memorandum not to exceed fifteen pages, on or before November 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 10/26/2021. (nmk)
October 25, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Broan-Nutone, LLC answer due 10/27/2021. (pjh, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 11/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/17/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Dryden Mutual Insurance Company in Onondaga County Supreme Court. (pjh, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Onondaga County Supreme Court, case number 008369/2021 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5687509) filed by Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dryden Mutual Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dryden Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew E. Whritenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: David E. Leach
Represented By: Kenneth M. Alweis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?