Dains v. Bayer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Krystal Dains
Defendant: Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer, Inc., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Conceptus, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Bayer A.G.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00208
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed plaintiff's status report/letter request (Dkt. No. #18 ) in response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (Dkt. No. 17 ) as to why the matter should not be dismissed for plaintiff's repeated failures to follow Court Orders. Counsel indicates he is new to the plaintiff's firm, and that prior counsel left the firm. However, there are multiple other attorneys at plaintiff's firm, at least one of which should have been monitoring this file after plaintiff's prior counsel left the firm. Thus, counsel's explanation for disregarding the Court's Orders is insufficient. Nevertheless, the Court grants that part of plaintiff's request and directs plaintiff to file affidavits of service on all unserved (or improperly served, if relevant) defendants by 5/9/2022. That part of plaintiff's belated request seeking an extension to respond to the pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #10 ) is granted to the extent that a response to the motion to dismiss is now due 5/6/2022; and reply is due 5/20/2022. Further requests for extensions of deadlines, if any, received after a deadline has expired will be summarily denied. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/7/2022. (sg )
April 6, 2022 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT/Letter Request to Magistrate Therese Wiley Dancks by Krystal Dains. (Marks, Harris) Modified on 4/6/2022 (sg, ).
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed docket and notes that Plaintiff has, for the third time, ignored this Court's Orders to file a status report on service of process per Dkt. Nos. 7, 11, and 14. Court has also reviewed the status report (Dkt. No. #16 ) of defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and appreciates the information. Per Dkt. No. 16, it appears Bayer, Inc., and Bayer HealthCare, LLC, have not been properly served. Because Plaintiff has repeatedly disregarded this Court's Orders, despite new counsel appearing for Plaintiff (see Dkt. No. #15 ), the Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to Show Cause by 4/11/2022 why this action should not be dismissed for failure to follow Court Orders and directives. If Plaintiff fails to show cause as directed herein by 4/11/2022, the case will be administratively dismissed and closed. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/5/2022. (sg)
April 4, 2022 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Rothman, Alan)
April 4, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Harris Marks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marks, Harris)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed docket and notes that defendant Bayer, Inc. and Bayer HealthCare, LLC are in default per the affidavits of service at Dkt. Nos. 12 and 13. These affidavits of service were apparently filed by Attorney Seth Dymond who has not filed a notice of appearance. Attorney Dymond must file a notice of appearance or any further filings by him will be summarily stricken from the docket. Court also notes that no affidavits of service have been filed regarding defendants Bayer Essure, Inc. and Bayer A.G., and plaintiff has once again failed to file a status report as directed in Dkt. No. 11. Plaintiff MUST file a status report on service of the summons and complaint on Bayer Essure, Inc. and Bayer A.G. by 4/1/2022, and also provide information about any contact plaintiff has had with the defendants who are in default. Failure to file the status report may result in sanctions including, but not limited to, dismissal of the action for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/29/2022. (sg)
March 17, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on Bayer Health Care, LLC served on Lisa Constant on 02/02/2022, filed by Krystal Dains. (Dymond, Seth)
March 17, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on Bayer, Inc. served on Lisa Constant on 02/02/2022, filed by Krystal Dains. (Dymond, Seth)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed docket and notes that Plaintiff has failed to file proofs of service or a status report regarding service as directed in Dkt. No. 7 . Court sua sponte extends the deadline for Plaintiff to file the status report as ordered. Therefore, Plaintiff to file proof of service of the summons and complaint on defendants Bayer, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Essure Inc. and Bayer, A.G. or status report re: service of summons and complaint by 3/28/2022. Plaintiff is warned that further failure to follow Court orders and directives may result in sanctions. Since a motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #10 ) has been filed by the only defendant to appear and the status of service on the remaining defendants is unknown, the Rule 16 conference and related deadlines are adjourned and will be reset as necessary after all parties have appeared.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/15/2022. (sg)
March 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Brenda K. Sannes Response to Motion due by 4/1/2022. Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H, #10 Exhibit(s) I, #11 Exhibit(s) J, #12 Exhibit(s) K, #13 Exhibit(s) L) (Rothman, Alan)
March 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Gibbons, Jr on behalf of Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Gibbons, John)
March 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan E. Rothman on behalf of Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Rothman, Alan)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed docket and notes that it appears that the only defendant served with the summons and complaint thus far is Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Plaintiff to file proof of service of the summons and complaint on defendants Bayer, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Essure Inc. and Bayer, A.G. or status report re: service of summons and complaint by 3/14/2022. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/7/2022. (sg)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Attorney John L. Gibbons, Esq., Email address is jgibbons@sidley.com. Admissions due by 3/18/2022. (ztc, )
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Rothman, Alan)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Attorney Michelle A. Ramirez, Esq., Email address is michelle.ramirez@sidley.com. Admissions due by 3/18/2022. (ztc, )
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 4/4/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/28/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, )
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court, Cayuga County. (ztc, )
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, Cayuga County, case number E2022-0068 (Filing fee $402 receipt number CNYNDC-5826154) filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc, )
March 4, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 3/11/2022. (ztc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dains v. Bayer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Essure Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conceptus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Alan E. Rothman
Represented By: John Gibbons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Dains
Represented By: Kristina M. Georgiou
Represented By: Harris Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?