Johnson v. Courtyard Erie Bayfront et al
Plaintiff: Robert W. Johnson
Defendant: Courtyard Erie Bayfront and Marriott Bonvoy
Case Number: 5:2022cv00514
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 626 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Filing 9 JUDGMENT The Report & Recommendation is ACCEPTED in each of the twenty-one above-captioned civil actions; The twenty-one above-captioned civil actions are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copy served via regular and certified mail) (egr)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON REPORT & RECOMMENDATION granting #5 Report and Recommendations. The Report & Recommendation is ACCEPTED in each of the twenty-one above-captioned civil actions; The twenty-one above-captioned civil actions are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/11/2022. (Copy served via regular and certified mail) (egr)
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Robert W. Johnson. (egr)
June 27, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. re: #5 Report and Recommendations, sent to Robert W. Johnson Address sent to 112 Court Street Apt. 2, Watertown, NY 13601 (egr)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert W. Johnson filed by Robert W. Johnson, #1 Complaint filed by Robert W. Johnson : ORDERED, that plaintiff's motions to proceed IFP are GRANTED FOR PURPOSES OF FILING ONLY, and it is RECOMMENDED, that the twenty-one (21) above-captioned actions be DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), and it is ORDERED, that plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel are DENIED AS MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2022 Case Review Deadline 7/8/2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/21/2022. (Copy served via regular mail)(egr)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee in this action, and his application to proceed in forma pauperis is currently under review by this court. Accordingly, there is no pending deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint until plaintiff's IFP application has been addressed. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/16/2022. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail](kmc)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert W. Johnson Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (egr)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained to Robert W. Johnson at time complaint was filed (egr)
May 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Courtyard Erie Bayfront, Marriott Bonvoy filed by Robert W. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Courtyard Erie Bayfront et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtyard Erie Bayfront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Bonvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?