Van Dusen-Janz v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Van Dusen-Janz
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, John Barrett, M.D. and Jonathan Oliva, D.O.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00584
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 14 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Crawford, Kelly)
July 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Neumann on behalf of Kristin Van Dusen-Janz (Neumann, Rebecca)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/11/2022. (jdp )
July 8, 2022 Filing 11 Supplemental Admission documents re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Baughman, Laura)
June 22, 2022 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca L. Neumann. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
June 17, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca L. Neumann Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5941042. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission PHV, #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Sponsor, #3 Exhibit(s) Attorney Registration Form, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Baughman, Laura)
June 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel L. Wright on behalf of Kristin Van Dusen-Janz (Wright, Rachel)
June 17, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J Baughman on behalf of Kristin Van Dusen-Janz (Baughman, Laura)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Crawford, Kelly)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly S. Crawford on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Crawford, Kelly)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, (Supplementing Notice of Removal with Exhibits B-C). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Crawford, Kelly)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Kristin Van Dusen-Janz; Attorney Martin Baughman, Rachel Writ, Rebecca Neumann, Email address is lbaughman@martinbaughman.com, rwright@martinbaughman.com, rneumann@martinbaughman.com. Phone number is (214) 761-6614. Admissions due by 6/17/2022. Emailed on 6/3/2022 along with copy of #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order.(egr)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/27/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
June 3, 2022 ***Answer due date set for Ethicon, Inc. answer due 6/9/2022; Johnson & Johnson answer due 6/9/2022. (egr)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in Supreme Court, State of New York: Jefferson County. (egr)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of New York, Supreme Court: Jefferson County, case number EF2021-00001618 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5924385) filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Dusen-Janz v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Van Dusen-Janz
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Represented By: Rachel L. Wright
Represented By: Rebecca L. Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Barrett, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Oliva, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?