Rood v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Tina Louise Rood
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2022cv00631
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on June 15, 2022. (ztc, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Natasha Oeltjen appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 9/13/2022. (Oeltjen, Natasha)
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Response to Filing Deficiency by Tina Louise Rood. (Lombardi, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT FORM filed by Tina Louise Rood advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (ztc, )
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. (ztc, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tina Louise Rood. (ztc, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (ztc, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Decision Unfavorable, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc, )
June 13, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #1 Complaint - Social Security Appeal, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney email address contained in the Complaint document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 6/16/2022 (Served via email on Plaintiff's Counsel) (ztc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rood v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Louise Rood
Represented By: Elizabeth Victoria Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Natasha Oeltjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?