Bachura v. Practice Resources, LLC
Plaintiff: John Bachura
Defendant: Practice Resources, LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00905
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
2 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's #10 motion, filed on consent, requesting an extension of time to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter. Defendant shall file a response on or before November 23, 2022. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/28/2022. (mab)
October 25, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Document replaced with correct Judge's name listed. (khr)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Practice Resources, LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/14/2022 Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Dahle, Alexander) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/25/2022) (khr, ).
October 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Scott Dahle on behalf of Practice Resources, LLC (Dahle, Alexander)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 10/19/2022. (khr) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/24/2022) (jmb, ).
September 19, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Defendant on 09/10/2022, filed by John Bachura. (Bilsborrow, James)
September 19, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Practice Resources, LLC answer due 10/3/2022. (khr)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference is scheduled for 12/6/2022 at 11:00 a.m., via telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/29/2022 (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court). SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/7/2022. (jdp )
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric for all further proceedings due to this case being related to 6:22-CV-890 (LEK/ML). The Hon. Lawrence E. Kahn remains the District Judge assigned to the case. The 11/29/2022 Initial Conference before Magistrate Judge Dancks is ADJOURNED. The conference will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Lovric and the parties will be notified of the new date and time in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/6/2022. (sg)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 9/6/2022. (dpk)
September 1, 2022 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 6:22-cv-890. (khr)
August 30, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618(a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. Initial Conference set for 11/29/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/22/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
August 30, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Practice Resources, LLC. (khr)
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Practice Resources, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6017210) filed by John Bachura. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bachura v. Practice Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bachura
Represented By: James J. Bilsborrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practice Resources, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Scott Dahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?