Sardella v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jacob J. Sardella
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Not Classified By Court: Hon. Edward Carni
Case Number: 5:2022cv01361
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
2 Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Hon. Edward Carni has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Kelsey W. Shannon and Mark T. Whitford, Jr.. Dated: February 8, 2023(Shannon, Kelsey)
January 20, 2023 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: A telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/24/2023 at 11:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial +1 315-691-0477 and enter ID code 396 383 159 to connect to the conference.(rep)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 2/10/2023. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 3/3/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on January 18, 2023. (rep)
January 18, 2023 Filing 10 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for the joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings is 3/31/2023. Discovery cutoff is 11/15/2023 (Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure Deadline is 7/14/2023. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 9/1/2023. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 9/18/2023). Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/1/2023. Anticipated length of trial is 4 days. Preferred trial location: Syracuse. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on January 18, 2023. (rep)
January 18, 2023 TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Rule 16 conference held on January 18, 2023 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: Parties inform the Court that mandatory disclosures have been exchanged. Counsel may submit a proposed protective order for the court's consideration and defense counsel agreed to prepare an initial draft. Pretrial deadlines were established. A scheduling order will be issued on behalf of District Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. A follow-up status conference is set for Friday, March 24, 2023 at 11:30AM by telephone. Appearances: Martin Lynn, Esq. for plaintiff; Mark Whitford, Esq. for defendant. Time: 1:03PM 1:11PM. (rep)
January 18, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin A. Lynn on behalf of Jacob J. Sardella (Lynn, Martin)
January 16, 2023 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: The telephonic Rule 16 Initial Conference is CHANGED IN TIME ONLY for 1/18/2023 at 1:00 PM and will now be held before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to call +1 315-691-0477 and enter ID code 899 710 089# to connect to the conference.(rep)
January 12, 2023 Filing 8 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Jacob J. Sardella. (Shannon, Kelsey)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric no longer assigned to case. So ordered by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/10/23. (lmw)
December 23, 2022 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Fire & Casualty Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Whitford, Mark)
December 23, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Whitford, Mark)
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jacob J. Sardella. (Shannon, Kelsey)
December 19, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company answer due 12/23/2022. (ztc)
December 16, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 1/18/2023 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/11/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court, Onondaga County. (ztc)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, Onondaga County, case number 009316/2022 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6134548) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit-Proof of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sardella v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob J. Sardella
Represented By: Kelsey W. Shannon
Represented By: Martin A. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mark T. Whitford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hon. Edward Carni
Represented By: Edward D. Carni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?