Hedman et al v. Fat Dough Inc. and any related entities
Plaintiff: Tracy Hedman, Malinda McMahon and James Montoya
Defendant: Fat Dough Inc.
Case Number: 5:2024cv00612
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Mitchell J Katz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER re #7 Stipulation: Defendant Fat Dough Inc. shall file an answer, or otherwise move on or before 7/25/2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 6/18/2024. (ztc)
June 18, 2024 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Appear by Fat Dough Inc. submitted to Judge Mitchell J. Katz. (Maugans, Christopher)
June 13, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by Tracy Hedman, Malinda McMahon, James Montoya Consent to Join by Tracy Hedman (Files, Ryan)
June 13, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by Tracy Hedman, Malinda McMahon, James Montoya Consent to Join by Malinda McMahon (Files, Ryan)
June 13, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Fat Dough Inc. on June 4, 2024, filed by Tracy Hedman, Malinda McMahon, James Montoya. (Files, Ryan)
June 13, 2024 ***Answer due date updated for Fat Dough Inc. answer due 6/25/2024. (hmr)
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/1/2024 at 09:30 AM via Video Conference before US Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/25/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fat Dough Inc. (hmr)
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 COLLECTIVE AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: with Jury Demand against Fat Dough Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6719774) filed by Malinda McMahon, Tracy Hedman, James Montoya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hedman et al v. Fat Dough Inc. and any related entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Hedman
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Ryan G. Files
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda McMahon
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Ryan G. Files
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Montoya
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Ryan G. Files
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fat Dough Inc.
Represented By: Christopher P. Maugans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?