Daughtry et al v. TGI Fridays, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin and Jennifer Daughtry
Defendant: TGI Fridays, Inc. and TGI Friday's New York LLC
Case Number: 5:2024cv00709
Filed: May 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mitchell J Katz
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set for 8/22/2024 and the 8/15/2024 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after disposition of the #11 Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 7/22/2024. (ztc)
July 22, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #1 Complaint, filed by TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc.. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TGI Fridays, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 8/12/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/19/2024 (Brecher, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2024 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendants TGI Friday's New York LLC and TGI Fridays, Inc. to file an answer or otherwise move on or before 7/22/2024. (ztc)
June 17, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 7/8/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Stipulation Extending Time) Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Minard Carkner on May 30, 2024, filed by Jennifer Daughtry, Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin. (Gattuso, Frank)
June 14, 2024 *** Answer due date set for TGI Fridays, Inc. and TGI Friday's New York LLC. Answers due 6/20/2024. (kck)
June 13, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Brecher on behalf of TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc. (Brecher, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian A. Bodansky on behalf of TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc. (Bodansky, Brian)
June 13, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jennifer Daughtry, Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin Consent to Join by Natasha Sellin (Files, Ryan)
June 13, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jennifer Daughtry, Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin Consent to Join by Jennifer Daughtry (Files, Ryan)
May 24, 2024 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/15/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ham)
May 24, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TGI Fridays, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for TGI Friday's New York LLC)(ham)
May 24, 2024 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against TGI Friday's New York LLC, TGI Fridays, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6744292) filed by Jennifer Daughtry, Brittany Lopergalo, Natasha Sellin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daughtry et al v. TGI Fridays, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGI Fridays, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Brecher
Represented By: Brian A. Bodansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGI Friday's New York LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Brecher
Represented By: Brian A. Bodansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Lopergalo
Represented By: Michele A. Moreno
Represented By: James E. Murphy
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Sellin
Represented By: Michele A. Moreno
Represented By: James E. Murphy
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Daughtry
Represented By: Michele A. Moreno
Represented By: James E. Murphy
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?