Aderohunmu v. Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center
Plaintiff: Adeyemi Aderohunmu
Defendant: Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center
Case Number: 5:2024cv00731
Filed: May 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2024 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center. (Magley, Liza)
July 18, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center.(Magley, Liza)
July 2, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suzanne M. Messer on behalf of Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center (Messer, Suzanne)
July 2, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Liza R. Magley on behalf of Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center (Magley, Liza)
June 27, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Christine Standford on June 25, 2024, filed by Adeyemi Aderohunmu. (Files, Ryan)
June 27, 2024 ***Answer due date updated for Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center. Answer due 7/18/2024. (mmg).
June 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by Adeyemi Aderohunmu Consent to Join by Adeyemi Aderohunmu (Files, Ryan)
June 3, 2024 TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference set for 9/4/2024 at 10:00 before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc)
May 31, 2024 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 9/4/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/28/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (tll)
May 31, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center. (tll)
May 31, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand - FLSA Collective Action and Class Action against Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6751460) filed by Adeyemi Aderohunmu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aderohunmu v. Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretto Health & Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Liza R. Magley
Represented By: Suzanne M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adeyemi Aderohunmu
Represented By: Ryan G. Files
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?