Euson, Jr v. TRC Engineers, LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas Euson, Jr
Defendant: TRC Engineers, LLC
Case Number: 5:2024cv01168
Filed: September 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TRC Engineers, LLC. Motion returnable before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 11/27/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/4/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s) MOL Ex. A - Statutory History, #3 Affirmation, #4 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. A - Complaint, #5 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. B - Bazinett Decision, #6 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. C - L. 1890, ch. 388, #7 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. D - Bill Jacket, L. 1935, ch. 619, #8 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. E - Bill Jacket, L. 2009, ch. 372, #9 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. F - L. 1897, ch. 415, #10 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. G - L. 1908, ch. 442, #11 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. H - L. 1921, ch. 50, #12 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. I - L. 1935, ch. 619, #13 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. J - Memo in Support of L. 1966, ch. 548, #14 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. K - L. 1966, ch. 548, #15 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. L - L. 1987, ch. 404, #16 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. M - L. 1989, ch. 38, #17 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. N - L. 1993, ch. 168, #18 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. O - L. 2007, ch. 304, #19 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. P - L. 2002, ch. 427, #20 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. Q - Bill Jacket, Budget Rep., L. 1980, ch. 697, #21 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. R - L. 1987, ch. 417, #22 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. S - Memo, Bill Jacket for L. 1987, ch. 417, #23 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. T - L. 1937, ch. 500, #24 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. U - Letter, Legal Aid Comm. of Ass'n of Bar of City of NY, Bill Jacket for L. 1937, ch. 500, #25 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. V - L. 2010, ch. 564, #26 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. W - Comm. of Labor's Memo, Bill Jacket for L. 2010, ch. 564, #27 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. X - L. 2021, ch. 397, #28 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. Y - L. 1967, ch. 310, #29 Exhibit(s) JMK Affirmation Ex. Z - L. 1997, ch. 605, #30 Declaration Declaration of Regina R. Robertson) (Kozak, Jonathan)
November 6, 2024 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #20 letter-motion from Jonathan Kozak, Esq. for TRC Engineers, LLC requesting Expansion of Page Limitation for Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint limited to 30 pages. SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge Glenn T Suddaby on 11/6/2024. (sal)
November 6, 2024 Filing 22 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TRC Engineers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TRC Companies, Inc. for TRC Engineers, LLC.. (Wilkinson, Benjamin)
November 6, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 Letter Request/Motion, for Additional Pages filed by Thomas Euson, Jr. (Hogg, William)
November 5, 2024 Filing 20 Letter Motion from Jonathan Kozak, Esq. for TRC Engineers, LLC requesting Expansion of Page Limitation for Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby . (Wilkinson, Benjamin)
October 25, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Wilkinson on behalf of TRC Engineers, LLC (Wilkinson, Benjamin)
October 25, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan M. Kozak on behalf of TRC Engineers, LLC (Kozak, Jonathan)
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed parties' stipulation (Dkt. No. #16 ) which the Court construes as a request for an extension of time for the defendant to respond to the complaint which is granted although no good cause reason or any reason for the request has been proffered. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by 11/6/2024. Any future requests for extensions of any deadlines set in this matter must show good cause. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/23/2024. (sg)
October 22, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by TRC Engineers, LLC submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. (Wilkinson, Benjamin) Modified on 10/23/2024 (sg, ).
October 14, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard J. Burch on behalf of Thomas Euson, Jr (Burch, Richard)
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Olivia Beale. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/11/2024. (sg)
October 10, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cory S. Stott Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6896449. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Files, Ryan)
October 10, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Olivia R. Beal Filing fee $100, receipt number BNYNDC-6896398. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Files, Ryan)
October 10, 2024 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #13 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cory S. Scott. The documents pertain to a different attorney. Accordingly, pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Declaration of Sponsor, a fully completed Petition for Admission, a New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form and a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
October 8, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William M. Hogg on behalf of Thomas Euson, Jr (Hogg, William)
October 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE by Thomas Euson, Jr of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Consent Form)(Hogg, William)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Hogg. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/4/2024. (sg)
October 4, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Euson, Jr. TRC Engineers, LLC served on 10/2/2024, answer due 10/23/2024. (Josephson, Michael)
October 3, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William M. Hogg Filing fee $100, receipt number BNYNDC-6889770. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Files, Ryan)
September 30, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Dunlap on behalf of Thomas Euson, Jr (Dunlap, Andrew)
September 30, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Josephson on behalf of Thomas Euson, Jr (Josephson, Michael)
September 25, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Plaintiff; Attorney Richard M. Schreiber,Email address is rschreiber@mybackwages.com, Phone number is 713-352-1100. As to Attorney Richard Burch, Email address is rburch@brucknerburch.com, Phone number is 713-877-8788. COPY OF G.O. 25 AND ADMISSION REQUIREMENT WERE SENT TO EACH ATTORNEY VIA EMAIL. Admissions due by 10/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Admission Requirment as to Richard Burch)(sbb)
September 25, 2024 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 12/30/2024 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/23/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sbb)
September 25, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TRC Engineers, LLC. (sbb)
September 25, 2024 Filing 1 CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against TRC Engineers, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6879389) filed by Thomas Euson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Euson, Jr v. TRC Engineers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRC Engineers, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin M. Wilkinson
Represented By: Jonathan M. Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Euson, Jr
Represented By: Ryan G. Files
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: William M. Hogg
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Andrew Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?