Kenney v. Clay et al
Plaintiff: Derek Kenney
Defendant: Anthony Clay, James Lorenzoni, Edgar Beaudin, John Does 1-5 and The City of Gloversville
Case Number: 6:2011cv00790
Filed: July 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Utica Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Andrew T. Baxter
Presiding Judge: David N. Hurd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER: approving the # 114 Stipulation of Discontinuance, this action is hereby discontinued, with prejudice, without costs or attorneys' fees to either party as against the other. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 2/28/2017. (jmb)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER OF DISMISSING BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT: This action is dismissed in its entirety, without costs and without prejudice to the right to reopen within 60 days if its not consummated, unless extended by the Court. If the parties wish for the Court t o retain ancillary jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit a request that the Court retain jurisdiction. The dismissal shall become with prejudice on the 61st day. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/20/2016. (jmb)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM-DECISION & ORDER: It is Ordered that Defendant's # 70 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, Plaintiff's first cause of action for false arrest, sounding in federal law, is DISMISSED in its entirety; Plaintiff's second cause of action for malicious prosecution, sounding in federal law, is DISMISSED in its entirety; Plaintiff's third cause of action against defendant Officer Anthony Clay, alleging the violation of his Fifth Amendment ri ght against self-incrimination remains for trial; Plaintiff's fourth cause of action, alleging a Monell claim is DISMISSED as to defendant Officer Edgar Beaudin and remains for trial as to defendant City of Gloversville; Plaintiff's fifth c ause of action for malicious prosecution and false arrest, sounding in state law, is DISMISSED in its entirety, Plaintiff's sixth cause of action for intentional infliction of emotional distress andnegligent infliction of emotional distress, is DISMISSED in its entirety; Plaintiff's seventh cause of action for negligent supervision and retention ofemployees remains for trial, as to defendants Officer Edgar Beaudin and City ofGloversville; All causes of action against defendant Officer James Lorenzoni are DISMISSED, John Does 1-5 are DISMISSED; Plaintiff's demand for punitive damages remains for trial; and Plaintiff's # 83 Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint is DENIED. {Order refers to the # 91 Stipulation of Discontinuance for various dismissed claims} Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 3/23/2016. (jmb)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: approving the # 86 Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance. This action is hereby partially disconinued, with prejudice and without costs, including any attorneys' fees to either party as against the other as follows: a) in its entirety a s against all defendants in the first cause of action, b) in its entirety as against all defendants in the second cause of action, c) the fourth cause of action as against defendant Edgar Beaudin only, d) it its entirety as against all defendants, in the fifth cause of action, e) any and all claims made against defendant James Lorenzoni. Nothing shall be construed as discontinuing or limiting Plaintiff's ability to litigate his third cause of action and fourth cause of action as against the City of Gloversville only pursuant to 42 USC section 1983, nor his remaining pendant state claw claims in the sixth cause of action and seventh cause of action. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 10/28/2014. (jmb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenney v. Clay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Kenney
Represented By: Elmer R. Keach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Clay
Represented By: Gregg T. Johnson
Represented By: Mark J. Lemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lorenzoni
Represented By: Gregg T. Johnson
Represented By: Mark J. Lemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Beaudin
Represented By: Gregg T. Johnson
Represented By: Mark J. Lemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Gloversville
Represented By: Gregg T. Johnson
Represented By: Mark J. Lemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?