Golden Ring International, Inc. et al v. Cullen et al

Plaintiff: Trademit Limited, Golden Ring International, Inc. and Living the Dream Films, Inc.
Defendant: Matthew Cullen and Motion Theory, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01244
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Request. The Court hereby orders the Plaintiffs to serve process and all other documents, required by Section 1702(a) of the California Corporations Code pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(h)(1)(A) and 4(e)(1), upon Defendant Motion Theory, Inc. by delivering, within 30 days from the date of this order, by hand to the California Secretary of State, or to any person employed in the California Secretary of State's office in the capacity of assistant or deputy. Plaintiff is also directed to serve the process and required documents, as well as a copy of this order, on Motion Theory, Inc., c/o Matthew Cullen, Secretary, by certified and regular mail. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/13/2018. (nmk)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Letter Motion by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited requesting a an order to serve process upon defendant Motion Theroy, Inc. by substitute service of process. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 - True and correct copies the business entity details for Motion Theory, Inc. from the California Secretary of State., #2 Affidavit Ex. 2 - True and correct copy of an Affidavit of Non-Service on Motion Theory, Inc., #3 Proposed Order/Judgment Ex. 3 - Order [Proposed])(Markovich, Raymond) Modified on 12/13/2018 to clarify docket text and remove response deadline. (nmk)
December 11, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Matthew Cullen answer due 12/26/2018. (see)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service (Corrected) of Summons, First Amended Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice, General Order #25, Ci~il Case Management Plan, Filing Order, Case Assignment Form, Notice, and Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge served on Matthew Cullen on 12/03/2018, filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Markovich, Raymond)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; First Amended Complaint; Notice; Civil Case Cover Sheet served on Matthew Cullen on 12/03/2018, filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Markovich, Raymond)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Director Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - Inducement Letter, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C - Cullen et al. v. Hanley et al., No. BC 594640, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D - Cross Complaint filed in the Cullen Action by NSL on November 17, 2015, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. E - Copyright Application)(Markovich, Raymond)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 10:30 AM, by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/15/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). {Report mailed to Register of Copyrights on 10/23/2018} (see)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Matthew Cullen and Motion Theory, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Motion Theory, Inc.)(see)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; TRADE LIBEL; INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACT AND REASONABLE ECONOMIC EXPECTANCY with Jury Demand against Matthew Cullen, Motion Theory, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4542069) filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Ring International, Inc. et al v. Cullen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trademit Limited
Represented By: Raymond J. Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Ring International, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond J. Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Living the Dream Films, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond J. Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Theory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?