Schofield v. Cohen
Plaintiff: Linda Schofield
Defendant: Maxine Cohen
Case Number: 6:2019cv00174
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 TEXT ORDER: granting #14 Letter Request for an extension of time. The time for plaintiff to answer or otherwise respond to the counterclaim is extended to 4/15/2019. The joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/29/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 Conference is reset for 5/6/2019 at 11:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The court will issue dial-in instructions prior to the conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 3/6/2019. (nmk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 Letter Motion from Zachary C. Oren for Linda Schofield requesting an approximate thirty day extension to all deadlines in the above captioned matter submitted to Judge Baxter . (Oren, Zachary)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: granting #12 defendant's motion. The Clerk is directed to coordinate with defendant to provide her with an ECF Login and Password. Defendant is not permitted to allow others to use her ECF access on her behalf. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/27/2019. [Copy served on pro se defendant via regular mail.] (nmk)
February 26, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #12 Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Attached a copy of the mailing envelope to entry. (see)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant Maxine Cohen requesting to participate in electronic filing submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (see) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2019: #1 Mailing envelope) (see, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Linda Schofield by Maxine Cohen.(see)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: On 2/20/2019 the clerk's office received email correspondence from pro se defendant Cohen with an attached motion to obtain ecf login and password. Defendant Cohen is advised that, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5, neither the court nor the clerk will accept any filing via email. Neither the court nor the clerk's office authorized defendant to file these documents via email. Therefore, the documents received by the clerk's office via email on 2/20/2019 will not be accepted and will not be filed in this action. Further, the court will not accept any future filings via email. Defendant is reminded to submit any and all pleadings, motions and other documents relating to this action either via mail or in person to the Clerk of the United States District Court, Northern District of New York, 7th Floor, Federal Building, 100 S. Clinton St., Syracuse, New York 13261-7367. Documents received via email or facsimile will not be accepted or filed. The court will review any motion to obtain ecf login and password, once the motion is received and filed properly. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/20/2019. [Copy served upon pro se defendant via regular mail.] (nmk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: On 2/19/2019 the clerk's office received a fax from pro se defendant Cohen requesting forms and attaching her answer and counterclaim. Defendant Cohen is advised that, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5, neither the court nor the clerk's will not accept any filing via facsimile. The court did not authorize defendant to file these documents via fax. Therefore, the documents received by the clerk's office via fax on 2/19/2019 will not be accepted and will not be filed in this action. Further, the court will not accept any future filings via facsimile. Defendant is directed to submit any and all pleadings, motions and other documents relating to this action either via mail or in person to the Clerk of the United States District Court, Northern District of New York, 7th Floor, Federal Building, 100 S. Clinton St., Syracuse, New York 13261-7367. The court understands that the defendant was attempting to file her answer by the deadline and states that she has placed the original in the mail. In the future, if the defendant requires an extension of time to file papers in this action, she should request an extension from the court. The court sua sponte extends the time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and will await the receipt of the original documents. Defendant's answer is to be filed on or before 2/28/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/19/2019. [Copy served upon pro se defendant via regular mail.] (nmk)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linda Schofield re #7 Notice of Appearance (Oren, Zachary)
February 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary C. Oren on behalf of Linda Schofield (Oren, Zachary)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM via telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) [Served on pro se plaintiff via regular mail on 2/15/2019.](meb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: In light of defendant's payment of the filing fee, #3 defendant's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED AS MOOT. Any answer or response to the complaint is to be filed by 2/19/2019. The Clerk is directed to issued General Order 25 and set a Rule 16 conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/14/2019. [Copy served upon pro se defendant regular mail.] (nmk)
February 12, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number SYR054356. (meb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Maxine Cohen on 2/11/2019 by regular mail along with enclosures. (see)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Maxine Cohen. Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (see)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Herkimer County, case number 18-104846 filed by Maxine Cohen. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Fax cover sheet, #3 Cover letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schofield v. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxine Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Schofield
Represented By: Tod M. Lascurettes
Represented By: Zachary C. Oren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?