Upstate Service Group, LLC v. Folts Home and Folts Adult Home, Inc.

Appellant: Upstate Service Group, LLC
Appellee: Folts Home and Folts Adult Home, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00270
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Scheduling Notice: Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal is set for 8/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. Appellant Brief due by 5/20/2019. This appeal will be considered on the submission of the papers, only. No personal appearances are required. No oral arguments will be entertained.***A copy of this Notice was served upon Trustee party via US Mail. (sas)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Appellant's Designation of the Items to be Included on Appeal and Statement of Issues to be Presented filed by Upstate Service Group, LLC re #1 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Joint Affidavit of Anthony E. Piana, DDS and James H. Morey, #2 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f), #3 Objection to Motion to Sell Property, #4 Letter re: submission of proposed order approving bid procedures, #5 Application to Employ Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC, #6 Order Granting Motion to Sell, #7 Order Granting Application to Employ Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC, #8 Supplemental Objection filed by U.S. Trustee, #9 IRS Objection to Motion to Sell, #10 Supplemental Response by Debtor, #11 Order Granting Motion to Sell, #12 Order Granting Application for Compensation, #13 Application for Administrative Expenses, #14 Adjournment request, #15 Adjournment request, #16 Adjournment request, #17 Adjournment request, #18 Adjournment request, #19 Adjournment request, #20 Transcript of hearing held 9/26/2018, #21 Letter/Brief in further support of motion, #22 Transcript of Hearing Held 11/14/18, #23 Letter Decision and Order, #24 Notice of Appeal)(usbcns, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(usbcns, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal filed with the Bankruptcy Court on 2/27/2019 by Upstate Service Group, LLC. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-60139. (usbcns, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upstate Service Group, LLC v. Folts Home and Folts Adult Home, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Upstate Service Group, LLC
Represented By: Amy Shapiro
Represented By: Harvey D. Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Folts Home and Folts Adult Home, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Zagraniczny
Represented By: Stephen A. Donato
Represented By: Camille Wolnik Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?