Silverscape Property Management v. American Zurich Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Silverscape Property Management
Defendant: American Zurich Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00397
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Zurich Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #5 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Capote, Ashlyn)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Zurich Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group LTD for American Zurich Insurance Company.. (Capote, Ashlyn)
April 4, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for American Zurich Insurance Company answer due 4/9/2019. (dpk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/6/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating the conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/29/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.)(dpk)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by American Zurich Insurance Company. (dpk)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by American Zurich Insurance Company. (dpk)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Oneida, case number 2019-000647 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4699346) filed by American Zurich Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint - State Court), #2 Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Service - State Court), #3 Exhibit C (Amended Complaint - State Court), #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverscape Property Management v. American Zurich Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silverscape Property Management
Represented By: Harry A. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Zurich Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashlyn M. Capote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?