Alghaithy v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Najeed Dhan Alghaithy
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv00772
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 2023
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER OF SETTLEMENT. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this stipulated settlement.. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 8/22/2019. (bjw, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and Order of Settlement by United States of America submitted to Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Eurenius, Carl)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Request for Judicial Review, Notice/Scheduling Order served on U.S.Attorney General's Office (David Burroughs, Authorized Agent) on 7/05/2019, filed by Najeed Dhan Alghaithy. (Williams, Jay)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for a stay of the administrative action pending a hearing and review of the USDA decision. As the government does not oppose Plaintiff's motion for a stay, the Court grants the motion. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dancks for all further pretrial matters. IT IS SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 7/12/2019. (bjw, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Request for Judicial Review, Notice/Scheduling Order served on U.S.Attorney's Office (Marla Reamy, Clerk/Receptionist) on 7/8/2019, filed by Najeed Dhan Alghaithy. (Williams, Jay)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Eurenius, Carl)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl G. Eurenius on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Eurenius, Carl)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that in light of #2 Motion to Stay an Administrative Action the Court hereby Orders that Pltf serve a copy of summons, complaint and motion upon the Deft by 7/5/2019 and file an affidavit of service; Deft shall file a response to the motion by 7/16/2019 and that a motion hearing will be held on 7/24/2019 at 11:00am in Syracuse. If the parties intend to call witnesses, witness list is due by 7/22/2019. Any exhibit list is also due by 7/22/2019.. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 7/2/2019. (bjw, )
July 2, 2019 MOTION SCHEDULING NOTICE as to #2 MOTION to Stay an Administrative Action. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2019 Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2019 11:00 AM in Syracuse before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. (bjw, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/20/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America - (Attorney General of the United States). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for United States Attorney)(hmr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Stay of Administrative Action Pursuant to 7 CFR 279.7(d) filed by Najeed Dhan Alghaithy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jay G. Williams III, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Supporting Documents/Information, #3 Memorandum of Law, #4 Exhibit A - Letter from Retailer Operations Division Dated February 26, 2019, #5 Exhibit B - Letter from Retailer Operations Division dated March 26, 2019, #6 Exhibit C - Final Agency Decision, #7 Affidavit of Service) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (hmr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Judicial Review Pursuant to 7 USC 2023(a)(13) and 7 CFR 279.7 against United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4785017) filed by Najeed Dhan Alghaithy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alghaithy v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najeed Dhan Alghaithy
Represented By: Jay G. Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Carl G. Eurenius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?