Annuch v. JCPenney Corporation
Plaintiff: Carmalita Annuch
Defendant: JCPenney Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv00865
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motions #15 and #14 are GRANTED to the extent that the Rule 16 IN PERSON Initial Conference currently scheduled for 9/18/2019 at 10:30 AM is hereby adjourned and re-scheduled to 9/25/2019 at 12:30 PM at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton, New York before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/18/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/5/2019. (jdp )
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 Letter Motion from Stuart E. Finer for Carmalita Annuch requesting Date of Conference submitted to Judge Lovric . (Finer, Stuart)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 Letter Motion from Stuart E. Finer, Esq. for Carmalita Annuch requesting Reschedule Date submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service of Letter to Reschedule)(Finer, Stuart)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #12 is GRANTED to the extent that the Rule 16 IN PERSON Initial Conference is hereby adjourned and re-scheduled to 9/18/2019 at 10:30 AM at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton, New York and the request to appear at the Rule 16 Initial Conference via telephone is DENIED. This Court conducts all Rule 16 Initial Conferences In Person. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:30 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/3/2019. (jdp )
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Stuart E. Finer, Esq for Carmalita Annuch requesting Adjournment submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Finer, Stuart)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart E. Finer on behalf of Carmalita Annuch (Finer, Stuart)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Finding #9 Letter Request as moot. Counsel is advised that the date for the IN PERSON Rule 16 Conference has always been September 4, 2019 at 10:00 AM. See #6 G.O. #25 as filed in this case at page 1, Conference Date/Time: September 4, 2019 at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/16/2019. (jdp, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Request Letter Motion from Christopher E. Wilkins for JCPenney Corporation requesting Adjournment of FRCP conference submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Wilkins, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JCPenney Corporation re #7 Answer to Complaint and General Order #25 (Wilkins, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by JCPenney Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Wilkins, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #6 G.O. 25 Filing Order. Replaced with a new General Order #25 that coincides with the Judge's Rule 16 schedule. (khr)
July 18, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for JCPenney Corporation answer due 7/24/2019. (khr)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/29/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/18/2019) (khr, ).
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party plaintiff; Attorney Matthew J. Fanelli, Finer and Giruzzi-Mosca, 2615 Genesee Street, Utica, NY 13501, Email address is stuart@stuartfineresq.com. Phone number is 315-724-7800. Admissions due by 8/1/2019. (khr)(Mailed copy of letter to Attorney on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JCPenney Corporation. (khr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT filed by JCPenney Corporation. (khr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JCPenney Corporation. (khr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from NYS Supreme Court, County of Oneida, case number ECFA2019-001719 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC4802232) filed by JCPenney Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Annuch v. JCPenney Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmalita Annuch
Represented By: Stuart E. Finer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCPenney Corporation
Represented By: Christopher E. Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?