Morse v. Schaal et al
Appellant: Patricia Morse
Appellee: Estate of Alberta M. Rossi and Randy J. Schaal
Case Number: 6:2019cv01015
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing compliance w/Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8006 w/in 30 days from the date of this order or the #1 Bankruptcy Appeal shall be DIMISSED. (Notice of Compliance Deadline: 10/18/2019). Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 9/18/2019. (amt)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Non-Compliance)(usbcns, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal filed with the Bankruptcy Court on 8/15/19 by Patricia Morse. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-61271. (usbcns,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morse v. Schaal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patricia Morse
Represented By: David G. Goldbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Estate of Alberta M. Rossi
Represented By: David C. Temes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Randy J. Schaal
Represented By: Randy J. Schaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?