Heumann v. Woodstream Corporation
Plaintiff: Henry H. Heumann
Defendant: Woodstream Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv01077
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Henry H. Heumann (Yarmolinets, Aleksandr)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER approving the #11 Stipulation and granting extension of time for Defendant to file answer. Woodstream Corporation answer due 11/12/2019, as the date in the stipulation is a date when the Court is closed. The telephone Rule 16 Initial Conference and the associated deadlines remain as previously set. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/23/2019. (sg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION (JOINT) to Extend Time for Defendant Woodstream Corporation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 by Woodstream Corporation submitted to Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (Song, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woodstream Corporation advising that no parent corporation exists. (Song, John) Modified on 9/23/2019 to clarify docket text wording. (jmb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Jian Song on behalf of Woodstream Corporation (Song, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry H. Heumann. Woodstream Corporation served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Yarmolinets, Aleksandr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Henry H. Heumann re #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, #4 Notice of Admission Requirement, Notice of Intent to Remain Counsel of Record (Yarmolinets, Aleksandr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksandr John Yarmolinets on behalf of Henry H. Heumann (Yarmolinets, Aleksandr)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Aleksandr J. Yarmolinets, Email address is ayarmolinets@bholaw.com. Phone number is 619-338-1100. Admissions due by 9/13/2019. (khr)[Copy of Notice mailed to Attorney on 8/30/2019]
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Timothy G. Blood, Blood Hurst & O'Reardon, LLP, 501 West Broadway, Suite 1490, San Diego, CA 92101, Email address is tblood@bholaw.com. Phone number is 619-338-1100. Admissions due by 9/13/2019. (khr)[Mailed copy of Notice to Attorney on 8/30/2019]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 09:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/25/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr) Modified on 9/23/2019 -moved the date of the conference up to the first line of this docket entry. (sg, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Woodstream Corporation. (khr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Woodstream Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4854533) filed by Henry H. Heumann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heumann v. Woodstream Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodstream Corporation
Represented By: John Jian Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry H. Heumann
Represented By: John A. Maya
Represented By: Aleksandr John Yarmolinets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?