Consiglio v. New York State Civil Service Commission et al
Plaintiff: Karen Consiglio
Defendant: Anatapur Panduranga, New York State Civil Service Commission, Richard Ciulla and New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities
Case Number: 6:2019cv01080
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 23 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 1:30 PM at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/13/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp )
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Ciulla(individually), Richard Ciulla(in his official capacity), New York State Civil Service Commission, New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities, Anatapur Panduranga(in his official capacity), Anatapur Panduranga(individually) re #21 Answer to Complaint, (Liberati-Conant, Christopher)
October 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: The Clerk contacted attorney Christopher Liberati-Conant on 10/16/2019 and advised that a Certificate of Service is required for service of the #21 Answer upon Rachel A. Allen (by mail) as she did not receive it by service through ECF. (jmb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Richard Ciulla(individually), Richard Ciulla(in his official capacity), New York State Civil Service Commission, New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities, Anatapur Panduranga(in his official capacity), Anatapur Panduranga(individually).(Liberati-Conant, Christopher)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: According to the docket sheet defendants time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs complaint has expired. Plaintiffs counsel is hereby directed to file either a request for clerks entry of default or a status report on or before 10/18/2019. The Rule 16 scheduled for 10/16/2019 at 11:00 AM is hereby adjourned without date, unless Defense files an answer. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/11/2019. (jdp )
September 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Liberati-Conant on behalf of All Defendants (Liberati-Conant, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 11:00 AM in Binghamton, IN PERSON, before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/9/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (plp)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Admission Requirement: Attorney Shari M. Goodstein, Esq. for Defendants, Email address is shari.goodstein@ag.ny.gov. Phone number is 212-416-8567. Admissions due by 9/13/2019. (plp)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Admission Requirement: Attorney Rachel Adele Allen, Esq. for Plaintiff Consiglio, Email address is rachel@dereksmithlaw.com. Phone number is 347-698-8308. Admissions due by 9/13/2019. (plp)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04997. electronically transferred when case opened
August 28, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York. (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE; ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, Plaintiff and Defendants, by and through their respective counsel, each hereby stipulates to and respectfully requests the entry of an Order (i) transferring this action to the United Stated District Court for the Northern District of New York, for the convenience of the parties and in the interest of justice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(b); (ii) extending Defendants' time to answer the complaint from August 27, 2019 until 30 days after the transfer of the action is effectuated; and (iii) directing the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York to forward the filings in this Action to the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York; and IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, the parties shall bear their own respective fees and costs relating to the transfer of venue to be effectuated pursuant hereto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/28/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Richard Ciulla(individually), Richard Ciulla(in his official capacity), New York State Civil Service Commission, New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities, Anatapur Panduranga(in his official capacity), Anatapur Panduranga(individually). (Goodstein, Shari) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Richard Ciulla(individually) answer due 8/27/2019; Richard Ciulla(in his official capacity) answer due 8/27/2019; New York State Civil Service Commission answer due 8/27/2019; New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities answer due 8/27/2019; Anatapur Panduranga(in his official capacity) answer due 8/27/2019; Anatapur Panduranga(individually) answer due 8/27/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/8/2019) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Consent addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Shari M. Goodstein dated July 3, 2019. Document filed by Richard Ciulla(individually), Richard Ciulla(in his official capacity), New York State Civil Service Commission, New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities, Anatapur Panduranga(in his official capacity), Anatapur Panduranga(individually).(Goodstein, Shari) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anatapur Panduranga. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Ciulla.(dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Civil Service Commission. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ANATAPUR PANDURANGA, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Karen Consiglio. (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RICHARD CIULLA, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Karen Consiglio. (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK STATE OFFICE FOR PEOPLE WITH DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Karen Consiglio. (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK STATE CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Karen Consiglio. (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
May 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Ciulla, in his official capacity, Richard Ciulla, individually, New York State Civil Service Commission, New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities, Anatapur Panduranga, in his official capacity, Anatapur Panduranga, individually. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16980498)Document filed by Karen Consiglio.(Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consiglio v. New York State Civil Service Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anatapur Panduranga
Represented By: Christopher Liberati-Conant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Civil Service Commission
Represented By: Christopher Liberati-Conant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ciulla
Represented By: Christopher Liberati-Conant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: Christopher Liberati-Conant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?