Bullis v. Ollinger et al
Plaintiff: Denise L Bullis
Defendant: Sandy Ollinger and Jeff Parker
Case Number: 6:2020cv00913
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set for 9/14/2020 and 9/8/2020 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after disposition of the #6 motion to dismiss. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/26/2020. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE - That Plaintiff's response to the #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction MOTION to Substitute Party shall be filed on or before September 14, 2020. (jel, )
August 25, 2020 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction MOTION to Substitute Party : Response to Motion due by 9/14/2020. Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/21/2020. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on SUBMIT only. No personal appearances are needed.(jel, )
August 25, 2020 Mailed copy of the text only notice and #7 notice to plaintiff by regular mail. (jel, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction ( Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/14/2020.), MOTION to Substitute Party Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe Response to Motion due by 9/8/2020 filed by Sandy Ollinger, Jeff Parker. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Substitute, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Declaration of William F. Larkin, #4 certificate of service) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Larkin, William)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandy Ollinger, Jeff Parker re #2 State Court Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Pro Se Handbook and Notice Issued, #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, (Larkin, William)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK, PRO SE NOTICE, AND COPY OF LOCAL RULES served by direct mail to Denise L Bullis. (map)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED:Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 11:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/8/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by pro se plaintiff Denise L. Bullis in Oneonta City Court Small Claim Part in the county of Otsego.(map)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oneonta City Court Small Claim Part, case number: SC-000096-20/0A filed by Jeff Parker and Sandy Ollinger. Filing Fee Waived. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Oneonta City Court Small Claims Part Original Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullis v. Ollinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Ollinger
Represented By: William F. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Parker
Represented By: William F. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise L Bullis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?