Agen v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Lewis L. Agen
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00948
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 10/21/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 1/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/23/2020. (jdp )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5. Preferred Trial Location: Syracuse. Joinder of Parties due by 12/16/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2020. Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Motions to be filed by 11/1/2021. Status Report due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/23/2020. (jdp )
September 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: initial conference held on 9/23/2020. Pretrial deadlines were discussed and set. The parties shall file status reports on or before 12/1/2020, regarding the progress of discovery. A telephone conference is scheduled for 12/8/2020 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are directed to call 877-336-1839 and enter access 5177238. Appearances: D. Schoonmaker, Esq., for Plaintiff; and P. Cantone, Esq., for Defendant. (jdp )
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Duane Schoonmaker on behalf of Lewis L. Agen (Schoonmaker, Duane)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT Certificate of Service for Civil Case Management Plan by Walmart Inc.. (Will, Pauline)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Walmart Inc.. (Will, Pauline)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT Certificate of Service for United States District Court for the Northern District of New York Court's Filing Order by Walmart Inc.. (Cantone, Peter)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT Certificate of Service for Demand for Jury Trial by Walmart Inc.. (Cantone, Peter)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart Inc.. (Cantone, Peter)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc.. (Cantone, Peter)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/16/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Attorney Edward A. Gibson. Phone number is 716-633-3535. Admissions due by 9/2/2020. {Notice sent to attorney via regular mail}(pjh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Attorney Sara T. Wallitt. Phone number is 716-633-3535. Admissions due by 9/2/2020. {Notice sent to attorney via regular mail}(pjh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Walmart Inc. in Oneida County Supreme Court. (pjh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Lewis L. Agen in Oneida County Supreme Court. (pjh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint filed by Walmart Inc. in Oneida County Supreme Court. (pjh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Lewis L. Agen in Oneida County Supreme Court. (pjh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oneida County Supreme Court, case number EFCA2019-003315 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5210396) filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Amended State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Answer to Amended State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Discovery Demands, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate of Service)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agen v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis L. Agen
Represented By: Duane Schoonmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Pauline Will
Represented By: Peter D. Cantone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?