The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Curtis et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Christian Metzger, Sierra Lawler, The Estate of Antonio M. Curtis, Kaela Hostetler, Gerald L. Curtis, Zachary Russell, Ryan Curtis, Joshua Lawler and Z. R.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00701
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Jaclyn D. Malyk, Esq. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America requesting Adjournment of Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference submitted to Judge Magistrate Miroslav Lovric . (Malyk, Jaclyn)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Gerald L. Curtis waiver sent on 8/10/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Malyk, Jaclyn)
August 3, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY, Pursuant to Local Rule 5.2, Clerk replaced 1 Complaint, Exhibit B to the Complaint and Exhibit E to the Complaint with redacted versions provided by Counsel as there were home addresses listed throughout. Clerk also replaced #5 Amended Complaint, Exhibit B to the Amended Complaint, and Exhibit E to the Amended Complaint with redacted versions provided by Counsel as there were home addresses listed throughout. Lastly, Clerk replaced Exhibit A to #6 Motion to Seal with a redacted version provided by Counsel as it contained home addresses throughout. (ztc, )
August 2, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re Docket Entries # 1 , # 2 , and #5 . Clerk updated the Docket Text of these entries as they contained the name of a minor. Clerk has also temporarily restricted Docket # 1 , # 2 , and # 4 until Motion to Seal/Redact #6 has been decided on. (ztc, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal/Redact Docket Entries re 1 Complaint, 4 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 2 Summons Issued, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Response to Motion due by 8/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Malyk, Jaclyn) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/3/2021) (ztc, ).
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gerald L. Curtis, Ryan Curtis, Kaela Hostetler, Joshua Lawler, Sierra Lawler, Christian Metzger, Z. R., The Estate of Antonio M. Curtis filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-H)(Malyk, Jaclyn) Modified on 8/2/2021 (ztc, ). (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/3/2021) (ztc, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/3/2021) (ztc, ).
June 17, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re 4 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement: Clerk added "Identifying Corporate Parent: Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America" to this docket entry. (hmr)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/8/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Curtis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Antonio M. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaela Hostetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald L. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jaclyn Dilascio Malyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?