Utica Mutual Insurance Company v. Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Utica Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00832
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
2 Judge: Brenda K Sannes
3 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: A Joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/20/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 conference is SET for 10/27/2021 at 10:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 3362194 to connect to the conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/13/2021. (kmc)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brenda K. Sannes and US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe, Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/3/2021. (jel, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion from Bruce M. Friedman and James Mercante, counsel for Munich Re for Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. requesting Reassignment to Judge Sannes Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/3/2021. (jel, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Bruce M. Friedman and James Mercante, counsel for Munich Re for Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. requesting Reassignment to Judge Sannes submitted to Judge Judge Sannes, Judge Sharpe and Clerk of Court . (Mercante, James)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/20/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. (hmr)
July 23, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 6:13-CV-1178 (GLS/TWD). (hmr)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Utica Mutual Insurance Company. (hmr)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5593836) filed by Utica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utica Mutual Insurance Company v. Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Syed S. Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
Represented By: James E. Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?