Delta Hardwood Flooring, Inc. v. Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Delta Hardwood Flooring, Inc.
Defendant: Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Hon. Anthony Paris
Case Number: 6:2021cv01054
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Honorable Anthony J. Paris has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Kelsey W. Shannon and David H. Walsh. Dated: 11/10/2021(Shannon, Kelsey)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 12/15/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 5/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/17/2021. (jdp )
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5. Preferred Trial Location: Syracuse. Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2022. Discovery due by 12/1/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 9/2/2022. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/17/2022. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 11/1/2022. Motions to be filed by 12/30/2022. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 5/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/17/2021. (jdp ) (Main Document 13 replaced on 11/17/2021) (jdp, ).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: On or before 1/31/2022, all parties shall file status reports regarding the progress of the litigation. A telephone conference is scheduled for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/17/2021.(jdp )
November 17, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: an initial conference was held on 11/17/2021. Pretrial deadlines were discussed and set. A telephone conference is scheduled for 2/18/2022 at 10:00 a.m. Appearances: K. Shannon, Esq., for the Plaintiff; and D. Walsh, Esq., for the Defendant. (jdp )
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Proposed by Delta Hardwood Flooring, Inc.. (Shannon, Kelsey)
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company.(Walsh, David)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Letter Request. Defendant's response to the Complaint is now due by October 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/28/2021. (jdp )
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Delta Hardwood Flooring, Inc.. (Shannon, Kelsey)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey W. Shannon on behalf of Delta Hardwood Flooring, Inc. (Shannon, Kelsey)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith Treger Shelton on behalf of Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company (Shelton, Judith)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Cartwright on behalf of Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company (Cartwright, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 Letter Motion from Defendant for Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company requesting Extension submitted to Judge Lovric . (Walsh, David)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 11:00 AM. All conferences will be conducted by way of telephone conference. The parties are directed to call (877) 402-9753 and enter access code 9983518. To be heard before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/10/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company. (egr)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York State - County of Oneida, case number EFCA2021-002069 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5658045) filed by Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)
September 23, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company answer due 9/30/2021. (egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Hardwood Flooring, Inc. v. Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Hardwood Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey W. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David H. Walsh, IV
Represented By: Daniel Cartwright
Represented By: Judith Treger Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hon. Anthony Paris
Represented By: Anthony J. Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?