Worn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dezarea Worn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2021cv01138
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number UTC003328 (hmr)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security re 8 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner (Richards, Jessica)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jessica Richards appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 1/24/2022. (Richards, Jessica)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis of Dezarea Worn: Based upon the Court's review of the information Plaintiff has provided, the Court finds plaintiff has the means to pay the filing fee associated with this action. WHEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED, that the Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. #3 ) is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED, that on or before November 18, 2021, Plaintiff shall pay the $402 filing fee; and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiff's failure to comply with the terms of this Order may result in the administrative closure of this action. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/21/2021.(A copy of this Text Order has been served on pro se party(ies) via regular mail.) (sg)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 PRO SE NOTICE issued and explained to Dezarea Worn at time complaint was filed. Pro se stated she had copies of all documents being filed at home and was provided a copy of the first page of each filing and a copy of the General Order 18. Pro se advised that she was previously provided with the local rules and pro se handbook. (pjh, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Dezarea Worn advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (pjh, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 11/10/2021. (pjh, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dezarea Worn, Pro Se. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (pjh, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (pjh, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dezarea Worn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jessica Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?