Jimenez Vega et al v. Fox Building Group, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Wilmer Orellana, Jose Luis Juarez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, The Estate of Melvin Orellana, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Eliu Cardona Alvarado, Fernando Pineda, Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Luis Orellana Martinez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, Junior Gonzalez, Jose Pineda, German Hernandez Castro, David Aguilera Alvarez, Jorge Amaya, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Jeremias Cardona, Edwin Garcia Molina, Jose Lainez and Robinson Aguilera Rivas
Defendant: Fox Building Group, Inc., Fenix Finishing, LLC and Vega's Drywall Contracting, LLC
Case Number: 6:2024cv00785
Filed: June 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mitchell J Katz
Referring Judge: Anne M Nardacci
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2024 TEXT NOTICE of the video Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 8/21/2024 at 9:30 AM: The parties are directed to connect to conference using the link that has been provided to the parties by separate email. If the parties are not able to join by video, dial 315-691-0477 and enter code 576 672 231# to connect to the conference.(kmc)
August 13, 2024 Filing 52 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Eliu Cardona Alvarado, Jorge Amaya, Jeremias Cardona, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Luis Juarez, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, Fernando Pineda, Jose Pineda, The Estate of Melvin Orellana. (Curwood, Craig)
August 13, 2024 Filing 51 Letter Motion from Parties' Requesting Hold to Scheduling Order in Abeyance (details in letter) for David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Eliu Cardona Alvarado, Jorge Amaya, Jeremias Cardona, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Luis Juarez, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, Fernando Pineda, Jose Pineda, The Estate of Melvin Orellana requesting Hold Scheduling Order in Abeyance . (Curwood, Craig)
July 26, 2024 Filing 50 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, filed by David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Eliu Cardona Alvarado, Jorge Amaya, Jeremias Cardona, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Luis Juarez, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, Fernando Pineda, Jose Pineda, The Estate of Melvin Orellana. Response to Motion due by 8/16/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Proposed Amended Pleading, #4 Exhibit(s) 1, #5 Exhibit(s) 2, #6 Exhibit(s) 3) Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (Curwood, Craig)
July 2, 2024 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig J Curwood on behalf of David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Eliu Cardona Alvarado, Jorge Amaya, Jeremias Cardona, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Luis Juarez, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, Fernando Pineda, Jose Pineda, The Estate of Melvin Orellana (Curwood, Craig)
July 2, 2024 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samantha Galina on behalf of David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Eliu Cardona Alvarado, Jorge Amaya, Jeremias Cardona, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Luis Juarez, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, Fernando Pineda, Jose Pineda, The Estate of Melvin Orellana (Galina, Samantha)
July 2, 2024 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zev H Antell on behalf of David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Eliu Cardona Alvarado, Jorge Amaya, Jeremias Cardona, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Luis Juarez, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, Fernando Pineda, Jose Pineda, The Estate of Melvin Orellana (Antell, Zev)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER: Granting #42 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Samantha R. Galina. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Attorney Galina is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of plaintiff. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 6/28/2024. (ztc)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER: Granting #41 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Zev H. Antell. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Attorney Antell is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of plaintiff. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 6/28/2024. (ztc)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: Granting #40 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Craig J. Curwood. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Attorney Curwood is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of plaintiff. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 6/28/2024. (ztc)
June 28, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine E. Gavett on behalf of Fox Building Group, Inc. (Gavett, Katherine)
June 27, 2024 Filing 42 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samantha R. Galina Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6782277. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (Ferris, Jonathan)
June 27, 2024 Filing 41 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zev H. Antell Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6782274. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (Ferris, Jonathan)
June 27, 2024 Filing 40 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig J. Curwood Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6782268. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (Ferris, Jonathan)
June 25, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thomas, J.)
June 25, 2024 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan W. Ferris on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ferris, Jonathan)
June 24, 2024 Filing 37 Letter from Attorney Amy E. Smith advising the Court that she is not going to represent the Defendant Vega's Drywall Contracting, LLC, as she is not admitted to NDNY. Mr. Vega has been informed of this matter and has been provided a list of attorneys/law firms in New York to contact regarding the pending litigation in NDNY. (ham)
June 18, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICES OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: Attorneys Craig Curwood, Samantha Galina, Zev Antell, Nichole Vanderslice and Amy Smith. Email addresses are: craig@butlercurwood.com; samantha@butlercurwood.com; zev@butlercurwood.com; nvanderslice@nbvlaw.com; asmith@islerdare.com. Phone number for Attorneys Curwood, Galina and Antell is: 804-648-4848. Phone number for Attorney Vanderslice is: 804-272-2920. Phone number for Attorney Smith is: 804-489-5509. Admissions due by 7/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Galina notice, #2 Antell notice, #3 Vanderslice notice, #4 Smith notice)(amt) [copies served upon all counsel via email]
June 18, 2024 Filing 35 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/21/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/14/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (amt) [Copy served on all counsel via email]
June 18, 2024 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:23-cv-00852. electronically transferred when case opened
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Transferring Case)- GRANTS the Consent Motion to Transfer (ECF No. #25 ); DENIES AS MOOT each of (i) Fox Building Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (ECF No. #12 ), (ii) Vegas Drywall Contracting, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue (ECF No. #17 ), and (iii) Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer to the Western District of New York (ECF No. #19 ); and in its discretion pursuant to 28 U.S. Code 1404(a) or, alternatively, 1406(a), DIRECTS the Clerk to TRANSFER this action to the Utica Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 6/17/2024. (adun, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
June 17, 2024 Case transferred to District of Northern District of New York. (adun, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
June 13, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Craig Juraj Curwood on behalf of David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Eliu Cardona Alvarado, Jorge Amaya, Jeremias Cardona, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Luis Juarez, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, Jose Pineda, The Estate of Melvin Orellana (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
June 7, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Craig Juraj Curwood on behalf of David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Eliu Cardona Alvarado, Jorge Amaya, Jeremias Cardona, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, Jose Pineda, The Estate of Melvin Orellana (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
June 4, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Craig Juraj Curwood on behalf of David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jorge Amaya, Jeremias Cardona, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, Jose Pineda, The Estate of Melvin Orellana (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Craig Juraj Curwood on behalf of David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
May 31, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Craig Juraj Curwood on behalf of David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
May 30, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Craig Juraj Curwood on behalf of David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
May 21, 2024 Filing 26 Memorandum in Support re #25 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the Utica Division of the Northern District of New York filed by David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana. (Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
May 21, 2024 Filing 25 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the Utica Division of the Northern District of New York by David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
May 21, 2024 Notice of Correction re: #26 Memorandum in Support; service date was not entered on the "Certificate of Service". (sbea) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
May 7, 2024 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of New York to Defendant Fox's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer filed by David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana. (Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of New York filed by Fox Building Group, Inc.. (Vanderslice, Nichole) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fox Building Group, Inc.. (Vanderslice, Nichole) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 30, 2024 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Vega's Drywall Contracting, LLC. (Smith, Amy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 23, 2024 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana. (Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of New York by David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana. (Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 10, 2024 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Vega's Drywall Contracting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Amy) Modified docket text on 4/10/2024 (adun, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 10, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Amy) Modified docket text on 4/10/2024 (adun, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 10, 2024 Filing 16 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Vega's Drywall Contracting, LLC. (Smith, Amy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 10, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Smith on behalf of Vega's Drywall Contracting, LLC (Smith, Amy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 9, 2024 Filing 14 Declaration re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #13 Memorandum in Support Declaration of Brian Gray by Fox Building Group, Inc.. (Vanderslice, Nichole) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 9, 2024 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fox Building Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Vanderslice, Nichole) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 9, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Fox Building Group, Inc.. (Vanderslice, Nichole) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 9, 2024 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Fox Building Group, Inc.. (Vanderslice, Nichole) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 9, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nichole Buck Vanderslice on behalf of Fox Building Group, Inc. (Vanderslice, Nichole) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 5, 2024 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Fenix Finishing, LLC. (sbea) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 5, 2024 Notice of Correction re: #8 Request for Entry of Default as to Fenix Finishing LLC; Clerk contacted filing attorney via email and requested an Amended Affidavit and provided the correct language this Court requires. Upon receipt of the Amended Affidavit, Clerk will swap it out and regenerate the NEF. (sbea) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
April 2, 2024 Filing 8 Clerk's Entry for Default as to Fenix Finishing LLC by David Aguilera Alvarez, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia, Edwin Garcia Molina, Junior Gonzalez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Wilmer Orellana, Claudia Orellana Gomez, Luis Orellana Martinez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Galina, Samantha). (Clerk replaced Affidavit for correct wording on 4/5/2024). NEF was regenerated. Modified on 4/5/2024. (sbea) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
March 25, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, Wilmer Orellana, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Edwin Garcia Molina, David Aguilera Alvarez, Claudia Orellana Gomez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana, Junior Gonzalez, Luis Orellana Martinez, German Hernandez Castro, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia Vega's Drywall Contracting, LLC served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024 (Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - It appearing that this action was filed on December 14, 2023, and that Answers were due by January 16, 2024, for Defendant Fenix Finishing and by January 26, 2024, for Defendant Fox Building Group, respectively, and that the plaintiffs have taken no action to prosecute the action, it is hereby ORDERED that, on April 15, 2024, this action will be dismissed unless before that date the plaintiffs act to advance the case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 3/18/24. (juljon) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
January 5, 2024 Filing 5 Certificate of Compliance as to Fox Building Group, Inc. served on 1/5/2024, answer due 1/26/2024. (adun, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
January 2, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Franklin Lainez Ordonez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, Wilmer Orellana, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Jose Lainez, Edwin Garcia Molina, David Aguilera Alvarez, Claudia Orellana Gomez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana, Junior Gonzalez, Luis Orellana Martinez, German Hernandez Castro, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia Fenix Finishing, LLC served on 12/26/2023, answer due 1/16/2024 (Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
December 15, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fenix Finishing, LLC, Fox Building Group, Inc., and Vega's Drywall Contracting. LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
December 15, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Roderick C. Young. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
December 14, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, by Darwin Jimenez Vega. (Curwood, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]
December 14, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9267090.), filed by Edwin Garcia Molina, Franklin Lainez Ordonez, David Aguilera Alvarez, Jecson Gonzalez Machado, Claudia Orellana Gomez, The Estate of Melvin Orellana, Wilmer Orellana, Luis Orellana Martinez, Junior Gonzalez, German Hernandez Castro, Darwin Jimenez Vega, Robinson Aguilera Rivas, Jose Lainez, Jonathan Castillo Lopez, Olvan Cruz Mejia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curwood, Craig) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/15/2023) (jsmi, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 6/18/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez Vega et al v. Fox Building Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Building Group, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine E. Gavett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fenix Finishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vega's Drywall Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmer Orellana
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Juarez
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olvan Cruz Mejia
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Melvin Orellana
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin Jimenez Vega
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliu Cardona Alvarado
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Pineda
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Elsy Membreno Portillo
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Lainez Ordonez
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Orellana Martinez
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jecson Gonzalez Machado
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Gonzalez
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Pineda
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: German Hernandez Castro
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Aguilera Alvarez
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Amaya
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Orellana Gomez
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Castillo Lopez
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremias Cardona
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Garcia Molina
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lainez
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinson Aguilera Rivas
Represented By: Zev H Antell
Represented By: Samantha Galina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Craig J Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?