Jackson v. Wylie et al
Plaintiff: |
Raymond L. Jackson |
Defendant: |
Andrew J. Wylie, Timothy Connolly, Mark Boire and Phillip Vonnortwick |
Case Number: |
8:2017cv00560 |
Filed: |
May 22, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Plattsburgh Office |
County: |
Clinton |
Presiding Judge: |
Christian F. Hummel |
Presiding Judge: |
David N. Hurd |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 31, 2018 |
Filing
14
JUDGMENT in favor of Andrew J. Wylie, Christopher Holland, Mark Boire, Phillip Vonnortwick, Timothy Connolly against Raymond L. Jackson. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular and certified mail) (jmb)
|
March 15, 2018 |
Filing
13
DECISION & ORDER: ACCEPTING and ADOPTING the # 11 Report-Recommendation, This action is DISMISSED with leave to replead within 30 days of the date of this Decision and Order. If plaintiff files a timely Second Amended Complaint, it will be forwarde d to the Magistrate Judge for review. If plaintiff fails to file a Second Amended Complaint within thirty days, the Clerk will DISMISS this action without further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 3/15/2018. (Copy served upon the pro se plaintiff via regular mail) (jmb)
|
September 28, 2017 |
Filing
9
DECISION & ORDER: ADOPTING the # 8 Report and Recommendations, Plaintiff's claims against defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice and all remaining claims DISMISSED without prejudice. This action shall be DISMISSED in its entirety pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e) unless, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Decision and Order plaintiff files an amended complaint, as to those claims dismissed without prejudice, that corrects the pleading defects iden tified in the Report-Recommendation. If plaintiff files an amended complaint within the referenced thirty (30) day period, then the amended complaint shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Hummel for his review. If, however, plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the referenced thirty (30) day period, then this action shall be dismissed without further order. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/27/2017. (Copy served upon the pro se plaintiff via regular mail) (jmb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?