Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Specgx, LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Cardinal Health, Inc., John and Jane Does 1 through 100 and Cephalon, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv01478
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45018, filed 01/22/2019. (plp)
January 18, 2019 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Ohio for inclusion into MDL-2804 National Prescription Opiate Litigation. (plp)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #75. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio for inclusion into MDL-2804 National Prescription Opiate Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Dan A. Polster, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
December 26, 2018 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendant, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (meb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe; Attorneys Lynn Lincoln Sarko, Esq., Derek Loeser, Esq., Gretchen Freeman Cappio, Esq., David Ko, Esq., Daniel Mensher, Esq., Alison Gaffney, Esq., Gabriel Verdugo, Esq., Phone number is (206) 623-1900. Admissions due by 1/4/2019. (Sent to attorneys via regular mail on 12/26)(meb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe; Attorney Dale T. White, Esq., Phone number is (518) 358-2274. Admissions due by 1/4/2019. (Sent to attorney via regular mail on 12/26)(meb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/12/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., #2 Summons Issued as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #3 Summons Issued as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #4 Summons Issued as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #5 Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #6 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson, #7 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #8 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #9 Summons Issued as to Cephalon, Inc., #10 Summons Issued as to Mallinckrodt PLC, #11 Summons Issued as to Mallinckrodt, LLC, #12 Summons Issued as to Specgx, LLC, #13 Summons Issued as to Cardinal Health, Inc., #14 Summons Issued as to McKesson Corporation, #15 Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation)(meb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does 1 through 100, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4599277) filed by Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe
Represented By: James R. Peluso, Jr.
Represented By: Donald W. Boyajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?