Whiting v. Rediehs et al
Plaintiff: Jean Whiting
Defendant: Chris Rediehs and The Saint Lawrence County Community Development Center
Case Number: 8:2019cv00016
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Chris Rediehs answer due 3/19/2019; The Saint Lawrence County Community Development Center answer due 3/19/2019. (jdp, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on St. Lawrence County Department of Social Services; St. Lawrence County community Development Center on 2/26/19, filed by Jean Whiting. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Antos, Susan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/6/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Chris Rediehs, The Saint Lawrence County Community Development Center. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Packets forwarded to US Marshal. (jdp, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER: Ordered that Plaintiff's #1 Complaint be accepted for filing and this case be allowed to proceed; Ordered that the Clerk shall issue a summons and forward it to the US Marshals, Ordered that a response to the Complaint be filed by the Defendants; and Ordered that the Clerk serve a copy of this Decision and Order Upon Plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/8/2019. (jdp, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/8/2019. (jdp, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jean Whiting. (Attachments: #1 IFP Attachment, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (jdp, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Rediehs, The Saint Lawrence County Community Development Center filed by Jean Whiting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whiting v. Rediehs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Whiting
Represented By: Susan C. Antos
Represented By: Saima A. Akhtar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Rediehs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Saint Lawrence County Community Development Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?