Perry et al v. Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center et al

Plaintiff: Holly Perry and William H Perry
Defendant: Robert Digiacco, M.D., Joshua Powell, M.D., Todd Howland, M.D., Ali Gharagozloo, M.D., Rashmi Thatte, M.D., Alexander Osei-Bonsu, M.D. and Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center
Case Number: 8:2019cv00726
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hurd, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E Hurd on behalf of Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center (Hurd, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER granting Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center's #30 Letter request to withdraw their #11 Motion to Dismiss.Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/30/19. (sfp, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 30 Letter Motion from Steven DeBraccio, Esq for Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center requesting withdrawal of our pending motion submitted to Judge Thomas J. McAvoy . (DeBraccio, Steven)
July 25, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ali Gharagozloo, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Answer)(Johnson, Eric)
July 25, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Todd Howland, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Laraby, Daniel)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting Ali Gharagozloo, MD's #26 request to withdraw #9 Motion to Dismiss. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/24/19. (sfp, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Ali Gharagozloo, M.D. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss re intent to withdraw (Felter, Karen)
July 24, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #23 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion. This was originally linked to the #9 Motion. It is a Declaration in Opposition to the #11 Motion by Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center. Corrected link in entry to document #11. (see)
July 23, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman)
July 23, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of an Answer filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman)
July 23, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman) Modified on 7/24/2019 (see, ).
July 23, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of an Answer filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman)
July 23, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman)
July 23, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center answer due 7/19/2019; Ali Gharagozloo, M.D. answer due 7/19/2019; Todd Howland, M.D. answer due 7/22/2019; Alexander Osei-Bonsu, M.D. answer due 7/22/2019; Rashmi Thatte, M.D. answer due 7/19/2019. (see)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Johnson on behalf of Ali Gharagozloo, M.D. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Johnson, Eric)
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for affidavit of service served on Rashmi Thatte MD on 06/28/2019, filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for affidavit of service served on Ali Gharagozloo MD on 06/28/2019, filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for affidavit of service served on Rashmi Thatte MD on 06/28/2019, filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for affidavit of service served on Todd Howland, MD on 07/01/2019, filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for affidavit of service served on Alexander Osei-Bonsu, MD on 07/01/2019, filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for affidavit of service served on Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center on 06/28/2019, filed by William H Perry. (Steiner, Norman)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of an Answer, #12 Notice of Appearance (DeBraccio, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven V. DeBraccio on behalf of Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center (DeBraccio, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in Lieu of an Answer Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2019 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/12/2019. filed by Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum of Law) (DeBraccio, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by William H Perry (Steiner, Norman)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2019 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/12/2019. filed by Ali Gharagozloo, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 certificate of service) (Felter, Karen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen G. Felter on behalf of Ali Gharagozloo, M.D. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Felter, Karen)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Digiacco, M.D. re #6 Answer to Complaint (Cooper, Adam)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Robert Digiacco, M.D..(Cooper, Adam)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Digiacco, M.D. re #4 Answer to Complaint (Cooper, Adam)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Robert Digiacco, M.D..(Cooper, Adam)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp )
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center, Robert Digiacco, M.D., Ali Gharagozloo, M.D., Todd Howland, M.D., Alexander Osei-Bonsu, M.D., Joshua Powell, M.D., Rashmi Thatte, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(jdp )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center, Robert Digiacco, M.D., Ali Gharagozloo, M.D., Todd Howland, M.D., Alexander Osei-Bonsu, M.D., Joshua Powell, M.D., Rashmi Thatte, M.D. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4775465) filed by Holly Perry, William H Perry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al v. Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Digiacco, M.D.
Represented By: Adam H. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Powell, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Howland, M.D.
Represented By: Daniel P. Laraby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Gharagozloo, M.D.
Represented By: Eric G. Johnson
Represented By: Karen G. Felter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashmi Thatte, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Osei-Bonsu, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claxton-Hepburn Medical Center
Represented By: Steven V. DeBraccio
Represented By: Jeffrey E Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Perry
Represented By: David M. Fish
Represented By: Norman Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H Perry
Represented By: David M. Fish
Represented By: Norman Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?