Cole v. Saul
Plaintiff: Carol Cole
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 8:2019cv00833
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 7/25/19. (lmw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Carol Cole advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Schneider, Mark)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: June L. Byun appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 10/21/2019. (Byun, June)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: In accordance with this Court's inherent authority to manage its docket, the Chief Judge having determined that reassignment of some cases is necessary in order to ensure an equal distribution of the work load and to effectuate a prompt disposition of all pending matters, this case is set to be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. The party(ies) are directed to file the attached consent or declination to transfer jurisdiction of this case to Magistrate Judge Dancks within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. In the event that the party(ies) fail to file such a consent or declination of jurisdiction by said date, this case will be automatically reassigned without further order of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 7/17/19. Notice of Compliance to file Consent/Declination Deadline: 7/24/19. (lmw)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Having considered the application to proceed without prepayment of fees under 28 U.S.C. 1915, plaintiff's in forma pauperis application is GRANTED. Pursuant to General Order No. 18 of this District, the defendant shall file a certified transcript of the administrative proceedings, which shall constitute as the defendant's answer, within 90 days of said service, or a motion to dismiss the complaint within 90 days of said service. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 7/12/19. (cam, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Carol Cole advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Schneider, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 8/1/2019. (sfp, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carol Cole. (sfp, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (sfp, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: June L. Byun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Cole
Represented By: Mark A. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?