United States of America v. Raville et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Housing Assistance Program of Essex Co., Inc., XYZ Corporation, Janet M. Raville, John Doe, Wayne A. Raville and Mary Roe
Case Number: 8:2019cv01172
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #5 Summons Returned Executed: Clerk removed "Mary Roe served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019" per 9/23/2019 Text Notice - no summons was issued for the Mary Roe Defendant. (hmr)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Housing Assistance Program of Essex Co., Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; Janet M. Raville served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; Wayne A. Raville served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole) Modified on 10/29/2019 (hmr, ).
October 10, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #4 Notice of Lis Pendens: Clerk added "Amended" to this docket entry. (hmr)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (LaBletta, Nicole) Modified on 10/10/2019 (hmr, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 23, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, Mary Roe and XYZ Corporation, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe", "Mary Roe" or "XYZ Corporation" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe", "Mary Roe" and "XYZ Corporation" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summonses will be issued at that time. (hmr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Housing Assistance Program of Essex Co., Inc., Janet M. Raville, Wayne A. Raville. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Wayne A. Raville, #2 Summons Issued as to Housing Assistance Program of Essex Co., Inc.)(hmr)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Housing Assistance Program of Essex Co., Inc., Janet M. Raville, Wayne A. Raville, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Raville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Assistance Program of Essex Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet M. Raville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne A. Raville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole B. LaBletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?