Hogan v. United States of America
Petitioner: Martin Hogan
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2020cv00286
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE re #1 MOTION for Writ of Error Coram Nobis: It is hereby ORDERED that due to the CORVID-19 pandemic, and the adjournment of the plaintitff's immigration proceeding until May 27, 2020, the time for the Government to respond to #1 Writ of Error Coram Nobis, is extended to April 23, 2020. Response to Motion due by 4/23/2020 (ban)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for petition writ of coram nobis served on USA on 3/18/2020, filed by Martin Hogan. (Moseley, Thomas)
March 20, 2020 Payment of Civil Filing Fee $400, receipt number ANYNDC-5067285 by Martin Hogan re #1 MOTION for Writ, 2 Text-Only Notice Regarding Judge D'Agostino Case Disposition Pilot, 3 Notice (Other),, . (Moseley, Thomas)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the #1 Plaintiffs Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis, filed 3/11/20. The Court hereby ORDERS that the Plaintiff personally serve a copy of the petition and a copy of this text order, upon the Government, by Wednesday, March 18, 2020 at 12:00 p.m.; The Court further ORDERS that once service on the Government has been completed, the plaintiff is directed to file proof of service electronically with the Court; The Governments response to the petition shall be filed on or before Monday, March 23, 2020 at 5:00 p.m.; No hearing will be scheduled at this time. (ban)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (jmb)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Error Coram Nobis filed by Martin Hogan. With attached supporting Exhibits and Cover Letter. (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martin Hogan
Represented By: Thomas E. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?