Downs v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn M Downs
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 8:2020cv00371
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarpello, Tracey)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Richard B. North, Esq., dd 4/3/2020 advising he will not be representing defts nor pursing admission in NYND at this time. (plp)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER deeming this case related to Doran v. CR Bard Incorporated, et al., Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-1126 (GTS/ML) under Section G.2. of General Order 12, because there exists a similarity of facts and legal issues between the two cases that will likely result in a substantial saving of judicial resources. Additionally, Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-1126 (GTS/ML) shall be deemed the "Lead Case" and this case shall be deemed a "Member Case." ALL FUTURE FILINGS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD ACTION ONLY, 5:19-cv-1126 (GTS/ML). NO FURTHER SUBMISSIONS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS ACTION. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 4/3/2020. (e-mailed counsel copy of text order) (sal)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Email address is richard.north@nelsonmullins.com. Phone number is 404-322-6000. Admissions due by 4/16/2020. {Served electronically upon counsel} (jmb)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-01730. electronically transferred when case opened
March 31, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Northern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-01730-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14293043 filed by Kathryn M Downs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn M Downs
Represented By: Rosemarie Riddell Bogdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?