Country Mutual Insurance Company v. Raven
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Timothy Raven
Case Number: 8:2020cv01451
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. Timothy Raven served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (de Luca, Daniel)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/16/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmc)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Timothy Raven. (kmc)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Raven (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5328560) filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Country Mutual Insurance Company v. Raven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Raven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth Brian Grear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?